« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FC2009-071687
Judge:
Garbarino, David
File Date:
12/24/2009
Location:
Northwest
Case Type:
Family Court With Children
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
David Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Sharla Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2010
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
5/20/2010
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Filing Date
4/28/2010
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference
Docket Date
4/28/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2010
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
4/30/2010
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/19/2010
Description
OCO - Order Attend Conciliation Srvs
Docket Date
4/26/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2010
Description
OCO - Order Attend Conciliation Srvs
Docket Date
4/26/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/8/2010
Description
231 - ME: Conciliation Terminated
Docket Date
4/20/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2010
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
3/23/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/15/2010
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
3/22/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
PETITIONER ATTENDED
Filing Date
3/11/2010
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
3/19/2010
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/11/2010
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/18/2010
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO CONTEST THE CHANGED DATES FOR RESOLUTION MANAGEMENT AND CONCILIATION SERVICES COUNSELING
Filing Date
3/10/2010
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
3/18/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONDENT ATTENDED
Filing Date
3/9/2010
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
3/9/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2010
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue
Docket Date
3/18/2010
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
3/8/2010
Description
233 - ME: Referral To Conciliation Services
Docket Date
3/19/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2010
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
3/3/2010
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
FOR CONCILIATION COUNSELING
Filing Date
2/23/2010
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
3/5/2010
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
2/18/2010
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/25/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 02/04/10
Filing Date
2/17/2010
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
2/19/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/9/2010
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
2/18/2010
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/9/2010
Description
MTO - Motion for Temporary Orders
Docket Date
2/18/2010
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
FOR CHILD CUSTODY FOR PARENTING TIME
Filing Date
2/9/2010
Description
SCP - Sole Custody Plan
Docket Date
2/18/2010
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO FATHER
Filing Date
2/9/2010
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
2/18/2010
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/9/2010
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
2/18/2010
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/24/2009
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
12/28/2009
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/24/2009
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
12/28/2009
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/24/2009
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
12/28/2009
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/24/2009
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
12/28/2009
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/24/2009
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
12/28/2009
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/24/2009
Description
ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf
Docket Date
12/28/2009
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/24/2009
Description
AFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children
Docket Date
12/28/2009
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
3/15/2010
Time
11:00
Event
Resolution Management Conference
Date
3/16/2010
Time
11:00
Event
Conciliation Court Services
Date
4/6/2010
Time
11:00
Event
Conciliation Court Services
Date
4/26/2010
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/20/2010
Time
9:00
Event
Resolution Management Conference