« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FC2009-053701
Judge:
Russell, Andrew
File Date:
11/24/2009
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Family Court With Children
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Darren Ray Troub
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Christine Rae Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2011
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
2/22/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2011
Description
042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full
Docket Date
1/18/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/15/2010
Description
RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
1/20/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/14/2010
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
1/21/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/22/2009
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
12/22/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2009
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated
Docket Date
12/14/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2009
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
12/4/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2009
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/4/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY/WITHOUT NOTICE FOR CHILD CUSTODY
Filing Date
11/30/2009
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
12/7/2009
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
11/30/2009
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
12/8/2009
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
11/24/2009
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
11/25/2009
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/24/2009
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
11/25/2009
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/24/2009
Description
SCP - Sole Custody Plan
Docket Date
11/25/2009
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO FATHER
Filing Date
11/24/2009
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
11/25/2009
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS FOR CHILD CUSTODY
Filing Date
11/24/2009
Description
ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf
Docket Date
11/25/2009
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/24/2009
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
11/25/2009
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/24/2009
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
11/25/2009
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/24/2009
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
11/25/2009
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
FOR PRE DECREE TEMPORARY ORDER WITHOUT NOTICE FOR CHILD CUSTODY
Filing Date
11/24/2009
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
11/25/2009
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/24/2009
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
11/25/2009
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
12/10/2009
Time
10:00
Event
Temporary Orders