« Return to search results Family Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: FC2009-001948 Judge: Wein, Kevin
File Date: 5/12/2009 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Family Court With Children  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Connie   Jones   Petitioner  Female  Elizabeth Feldman 
Dwight Lamon  Jones   Respondent  Male  Pro Per 
Bank Of America N A   Garnishee    JAMES SHIVELY 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
1/26/2017  DEW - Disposition Of Exhibit Worksheet  1/27/2017   
10/31/2016  LED - 2.8 (d) Letter  10/31/2016   
3/29/2016  STP - Stipulation  4/6/2016   
NOTE: STIPULATED / AND PROPOSED ORDER REGADING RETIREMENT FUND DISTRIBUTION AND ALL CHILD SUPPORT AND SPOUSAL MAINTENANCE OBLIGATIONS AND ARREARS 
3/29/2016  ORD - Order  4/6/2016   
NOTE: ADOPTING THE PARTIES' STIPULATED AGREEMENT AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING RETIREMENT FUND DISTRIBUTION AND ALL CHILD SUPPORT AND SPOUSAL MAINTENANCE OBLIGATIONS AND ARREARS 
3/18/2016  STP - Stipulation  3/18/2016   
NOTE: STIPULATED AGREEMENT AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING RETIREMENT FUND DISTRIBUTION AND ALL CHILD SUPPORT AND SPOUSAL MAINTENANCE OBLIGATIONS AND ARREARS 
1/25/2016  CME - Credit Memo  1/25/2016   
NOTE: Credit Memo / PETITIONER $84 ENFORCE CHILD SUPPORT  
1/22/2016  CCS - Petition For Contempt - Child Support  1/26/2016   
NOTE: MOTHER'S PETITION TO ENFORCE CHILD SUPPORT AND FOR CONTEMPT AND REQUEST TO ATTACH TO HUSBAND'S PORTION OF RETIREMENT / PAID $84 R#25010329 
9/4/2014  019 - ME: Ruling  9/4/2014   
8/21/2014  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated  8/21/2014   
8/18/2014  CSR - Case Status Report  8/21/2014   
8/13/2014  MAT - Motion to Appear Telephonically  8/18/2014   
NOTE: AT RETURN HEARING 
8/11/2014  NDI - Notice Of Dismissal  8/26/2014   
NOTE: VOLUNTARY/OF PETITION FOR ORDER TO APPEAR RE EXTENSION OF SPOUSAL MAINTENANCE AND REQUEST FOR ORDER VACATING RETURN HEARING 
8/5/2014  CSR - Case Status Report  8/5/2014   
7/30/2014  NOT - Notice  8/5/2014   
NOTE: OF WITHDRAWAL OF PETITION FOR ORDER TO APPEAR RE EXTENSION OF SPOUSAL MAINTENANCE AND REQUEST FORORDER VACATING RETURN HEARING 
7/14/2014  ACS - Acceptance Of Service  7/18/2014   
7/9/2014  REQ - Request  7/10/2014   
NOTE: Request for Clearinghouse's Compliance with Court Order 
6/25/2014  025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry  6/25/2014   
6/24/2014  ORA - Order To Appear  6/26/2014   
NOTE: RE EXTENSION OF SPOUSAL MAINTENANCE 
6/24/2014  NOT - Notice  6/30/2014   
NOTE: SECOND/OF ERRATA 
6/19/2014  NOT - Notice  6/23/2014   
NOTE: OF ERRATA 
6/13/2014  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel  6/26/2014   
5/30/2014  MSM - Petition To Modify Spousal Support - Osc  6/13/2014   
4/4/2014  ORD - Order  4/8/2014   
NOTE: RE INTEREST RATE APPLICABLE TO SPOUSAL MAINTENANCE ARREARAGE AND NEW ARREARAGE CALCULATIONS OF SPOUSAL MAINTENANCE AND CHILD SUPPORT 
3/25/2014  STP - Stipulation  3/28/2014   
NOTE: RE INTEREST RATE APPLICABLE TO SPOUSAL MAINTENANCE ARREARAGE AND REQUEST FOR ORDER TO RECALCULATE BALANCE DUE AND OWING 
1/28/2014  003 - ME: Hearing Reset  1/28/2014   
1/22/2014  RES - Response  1/27/2014   
NOTE: TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COORECT INCOME WITHHOLDING ORDER AND MOTION TO CONTINUE ORAL ARGUMENT 
1/17/2014  MOT - Motion  1/17/2014   
NOTE: Motion to Correct Income Withholding Order and Motion to Continue Oral Argument Set for January 23, 2014 at 3:00PM 
12/26/2013  IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access  12/26/2013   
NOTE:  
12/19/2013  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  12/19/2013   
11/22/2013  NOT - Notice  11/22/2013   
NOTE: Mother's Notice of Withdrawal of Petition to Modify Parenting Time  
11/19/2013  REL - Reply  11/20/2013   
NOTE: Respondent's Reply to Response to Request for Judgment on Spousal Maintenance Arrearages  
11/13/2013  ACS - Acceptance Of Service  11/13/2013   
NOTE: Acceptance of Service  
11/6/2013  ORA - Order To Appear  11/14/2013   
11/5/2013  RES - Response  11/6/2013   
NOTE: Petitioner's Response to Respondent's Request for Judgment on Spousal Maintenance Arrearages  
10/28/2013  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  10/28/2013   
10/28/2013  ORD - Order  10/29/2013   
NOTE: RULING 
10/23/2013  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling  10/23/2013   
10/22/2013  NOL - Notice of Lodging  10/24/2013   
NOTE: JUDGMENT 
10/22/2013  RJA - Request Judgment On Arrears  10/24/2013   
NOTE: JUDGMENT ON SPOUSAL MAINTENANCE 
10/4/2013  REL - Reply  10/4/2013   
NOTE: Mother's Sur-Reply to Father's Reply to Motion for Authorization of a Psychologist to Perform Evaluation of Respondent  
9/9/2013  MVS - Petition to Modify Parent Access  9/9/2013   
9/6/2013  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling  9/6/2013   
8/22/2013  REL - Reply  8/26/2013   
NOTE: TO PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR AUTHORIZATION OF PSYCHOLOGIST TO PERFORM EVALUATION OF RESPONDENT 
8/19/2013  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  8/19/2013   
8/7/2013  REL - Reply  8/12/2013   
NOTE: TO RESPONSE TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT 
8/1/2013  RES - Response  8/2/2013   
NOTE: Petitioner's Response to Respondent's Motion for Authorization of Psychologist to Perform Evaluation of Respondent  
7/25/2013  RES - Response  7/29/2013   
NOTE: Petitioner's Response to Respondent's Motion to Set Aside Judgment 
7/24/2013  ORD - Order  8/6/2013   
NOTE: STIPULATED / DIVIDING IRA ACCOUNT 
7/22/2013  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  7/22/2013   
7/15/2013  CSR - Case Status Report  7/15/2013   
7/12/2013  MSA - Motion To Set Aside Judgment  7/17/2013   
7/11/2013  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  7/11/2013   
7/10/2013  MOT - Motion  7/15/2013   
NOTE: FOR AUTHORIZATION OF PSYCHOLOGIST TO PERFORM EVALUATION OF RESPONDENT 
7/3/2013  REL - Reply  7/8/2013   
NOTE: MEMORANDUM TO RESPONSE TO MOTION TO APPOINT THERAPEUTIC PARENTING TIME SUPERVISOR 
6/21/2013  RES - Response  6/21/2013   
NOTE: Petitioner's Response to Respondent's Motion to Appoint Therapeutic Parenting Time Supervisor 
6/10/2013  MOT - Motion  6/13/2013   
NOTE: TO APPOINT THERAPEUTIC PARENTING TIME SUPERVISOR 
5/14/2013  019 - ME: Ruling  5/14/2013   
5/7/2013  NOT - Notice  5/7/2013   
NOTE: Notice of Non-Objection to Respondent's Accelerated Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for New Trial  
5/2/2013  MOT - Motion  5/7/2013   
NOTE: ACCELERATED / FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL 
3/29/2013  019 - ME: Ruling  3/29/2013   
3/12/2013  IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access  3/12/2013   
NOTE:  
3/12/2013  RES - Response  3/13/2013   
NOTE: RESPONSE AND OBJECTION TO CASE STATUS REPORT REARDING CHILD SUPPORT AND SPOUSAL MAINTENANCE ARREARS 
3/7/2013  REP - Report  3/12/2013   
NOTE: CASE STATUS/RE SPOUSAL MAINTENANCE ARREARAGE 
3/7/2013  REP - Report  3/19/2013   
NOTE: CASE STATUS 
3/4/2013  CSR - Case Status Report  3/4/2013   
2/26/2013  CEI - Current Employer Information  3/8/2013   
2/21/2013  JUD - Judgment  3/18/2013   
NOTE: Judgment: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties 
2/20/2013  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet  7/1/2013   
2/14/2013  RES - Response  2/14/2013   
NOTE: PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO RESPONDENT'S APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS 
2/14/2013  CEI - Current Employer Information  3/8/2013   
2/8/2013  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  2/8/2013   
1/25/2013  AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06  1/25/2013   
NOTE: UPDATED AFFIDAVIT OF FINANCIAL INFORMATION  
1/25/2013  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence  1/28/2013   
NOTE: PETITIONER'S 3RD SUPPLEMENTAL LIST OF WITNESSES AND EXHIBITS 
1/25/2013  AAF - Application For Attorney Fees  1/30/2013   
1/24/2013  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence  1/24/2013   
NOTE: PETITIONER'S 2ND SUPPLEMENTAL LIST OF WITNESSES AND EXHIBITS 
1/24/2013  STA - Statement  1/25/2013   
NOTE: PETITIONER'S SUPPLEMENTAL PRE-HEARING STATEMENT WITH CORRECTIONS 
1/23/2013  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence  1/23/2013   
NOTE: PETITIONER'S SUPPLEMENTAL LIST OF WITNESSES AND EXHIBITS 
1/23/2013  STA - Statement  1/24/2013   
NOTE: PETITIONER'S PRE-HEARING STATEMENT 
1/23/2013  CSM - Petition For Contempt - Spousal Support  1/28/2013   
NOTE: FIRST AMENDED COUNTER/ 
1/23/2013  STA - Statement  1/28/2013   
NOTE: PRE HEARING/RE PETITION TO MODIFY SPOUSAL MAINTENANCE AND COUNTER PETITION FOR CONTEMPT 
1/18/2013  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence  1/18/2013   
NOTE: Petitioner's List of Witnesses Exhibits 
1/15/2013  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  1/15/2013   
1/2/2013  019 - ME: Ruling  1/2/2013   
12/26/2012  CRC – Court Report Confidential  1/3/2013   
11/27/2012  NOT - Notice  12/3/2012   
NOTE: OF CONFLICT 
11/20/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  11/20/2012   
11/16/2012  AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06  11/21/2012   
11/15/2012  QDO - Qualified Dom Rel Order  11/20/2012   
NOTE: STIPULATED 
11/14/2012  STA - Statement  11/19/2012   
NOTE: PROPOSED RESOLUTION 
11/5/2012  003 - ME: Hearing Reset  11/5/2012   
10/24/2012  ACS - Acceptance Of Service  10/31/2012   
10/22/2012  ACS - Acceptance Of Service  10/30/2012   
10/12/2012  ORD - Order  10/17/2012   
NOTE: TO CONTINUE RETURN HEARING SCHEDULED FOR NOVEMBER 7, 2012 
10/11/2012  SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment  10/17/2012   
NOTE: FOR JUDGMENT ENTERED 4/12/12 
10/5/2012  RES - Response  10/11/2012   
NOTE: TO COUNTER PETITION FOR CONTEMPT 
10/5/2012  291 - ME: Mental Health Expert Appointment  10/5/2012   
10/4/2012  NOT - Notice  10/9/2012   
NOTE: OF NO OBJECTION TO COREY SHAW BEING APPOINTED AS THE THERAPEUTIC SUPERVISOR OF VISITATION 
10/4/2012  ORA - Order To Appear  10/10/2012   
NOTE: RE RESPONDENTS COUNTER-PETITION FOR CONTEMPT 
10/2/2012  NOT - Notice  10/5/2012   
NOTE: OF CONFLICT AND MOTION TO CONTINUE RETURN HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/07/2012 
10/1/2012  RES - Response  10/9/2012   
NOTE: TO PETITION TO MODIFY SPOUSAL MAINTENANCE AND COUNTER PETITION FOR CONTEMPT 
9/26/2012  NOT - Notice  10/2/2012   
NOTE: SUBMISSION OF THERAPEUTIC SUPERVISORS 
9/25/2012  ORA - Order To Appear  10/2/2012   
NOTE: RE PETITIONERS PETITION TO MODIFY SPOUSAL MAINTENANCE 
9/14/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  9/14/2012   
9/13/2012  005 - ME: Hearing  9/13/2012   
9/13/2012  REQ - Request  9/27/2012   
NOTE: THERAPUTIC SUPERVISOR REQUEST FOR TRANSFER 
9/11/2012  JAG - Judgment Against Garnishee  9/17/2012   
9/10/2012  MSM - Petition To Modify Spousal Support - Osc  9/14/2012   
9/10/2012  AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06  9/12/2012   
NOTE: UPDATED / 
9/7/2012  MEM - Memorandum  9/13/2012   
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF HER OBJECTION TO RESPONDENTS APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT AGAINST GARNISHEE ON WRIT OF GARNISHMENT 
8/31/2012  019 - ME: Ruling  8/31/2012   
7/24/2012  MOT - Motion  8/2/2012   
NOTE: JOINDER IN RESPONDENTS/FOR CLARIFICATION 
7/19/2012  005 - ME: Hearing  7/19/2012   
7/18/2012  MOT - Motion  7/20/2012   
NOTE: FOR CLARIFICATION 
7/13/2012  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet  7/31/2012   
7/13/2012  004 - ME: Hearing Continued  7/13/2012   
7/13/2012  ORD - Order  7/17/2012   
NOTE: ORDER OF PROTECTION MODIFIED 
7/13/2012  NOT - Notice  7/17/2012   
NOTE: TO SHERIFF OF POSITIVE BRADY INDICATOR 
7/13/2012  OPR - Order Of Protection  7/17/2012   
NOTE: AMENDED 
7/13/2012  ASP - Affidavit Of Service Order Of Protection  7/17/2012   
7/12/2012  NOT - Notice  7/24/2012   
NOTE: OF ATTORNEYS NON APPEARANCE AT ORDER OF PROTECTING HEARING 
7/11/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  7/11/2012   
7/9/2012  ORD - Order  7/16/2012   
NOTE: ON PETITIONERS MOTION TO CONTINUE ORDER OF PROTECTION HEARING SCHEDULED FOR JULY 9 2012 
7/5/2012  OPH - Order For Hearing On Order Of Protection  7/5/2012   
7/5/2012  046 - ME: Hrg Set Objection To Garnishment  7/5/2012   
7/5/2012  MCO - Motion To Continue  7/16/2012   
NOTE: PETITIONERS ACCELERATED/07/10/12 HEARING RE PETITIONERS OBJECTION TO APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT AGAINST GARNISHEE ON WRIT OF GARNISHMENT 
6/28/2012  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  7/12/2012   
NOTE: TO RESPONDENTS APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT AGAINST GARNISHEE ON WRIT OF GARNISHMENT 
6/27/2012  MCO - Motion To Continue  7/9/2012   
NOTE: ORDER OF PROTECTION HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 7/9/12 
6/25/2012  APL - Application  6/27/2012   
NOTE: FOR JUDGMENT AGAINST GARNISHEE ON WRIT OF GARNISHMENT 
6/25/2012  OPH - Order For Hearing On Order Of Protection  6/25/2012   
6/25/2012  RQH - Request For Hearing  6/27/2012   
6/25/2012  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  6/28/2012   
NOTE: SERVED 6/13/12 
6/18/2012  ANG - Answer Of Garnishee  6/25/2012   
6/14/2012  019 - ME: Ruling  6/14/2012   
6/12/2012  AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment  6/15/2012   
6/6/2012  OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel  6/20/2012   
5/18/2012  RES - Response  5/22/2012   
NOTE: TO PETITIONERS OBJECTION TO APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS AND RESPONSE TO MOTION TO CLARIFY 
5/10/2012  NWA - Notice Of Withdrawal Of Attorney  5/24/2012   
NOTE: FOR RESPONDENT 
5/10/2012  RQH - Request For Hearing  5/14/2012   
NOTE: ON ORDER OF PROTECTION ISSUED 05/02/12 
5/7/2012  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  5/11/2012   
NOTE: TO RESPONDENTS APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS MOTION TO CLARIFY AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION 
5/2/2012  PPR - Praecipe For Order Protection  5/4/2012   
5/2/2012  OPR - Order Of Protection  5/4/2012   
5/2/2012  POP - Petition/Order Of Protection  5/4/2012  Petitioner 
4/26/2012  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel  4/30/2012   
4/20/2012  AAF - Application For Attorney Fees  4/24/2012   
4/20/2012  STA - Statement  4/24/2012   
NOTE: OF COSTS AND NOTICE OF TAXATION OF COSTS 
4/17/2012  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet  5/2/2012   
4/12/2012  903 - ME: Judgment/Decree  4/12/2012   
3/22/2012  APL - Application  3/26/2012   
NOTE: FOR JUDGMENT AGAINST GARNISHEE ON WRIT OF GARNISHMENT 
3/19/2012  ANG - Answer Of Garnishee  4/5/2012  Garnishee 
3/19/2012  WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons  3/21/2012   
3/19/2012  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  3/29/2012   
NOTE: 03/15/12 
3/14/2012  AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment  3/16/2012   
3/5/2012  019 - ME: Ruling  3/5/2012   
2/21/2012  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration  2/23/2012   
NOTE: OF COURTS RULING ON RELEASE OF VIDEO RECORDINGS OF THERAPEUTIC SUPERVISOR ROBERT BAKER 
2/17/2012  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  2/23/2012   
NOTE: TO RESPONDENTS PROPOSED FORM OF JUDGMENT FOR SPOUSAL MAINTENANCE ARREARAGE 
2/10/2012  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  2/10/2012   
2/10/2012  NOL - Notice of Lodging  2/13/2012   
NOTE: JUDGMENT ON SPOUSAL MAINTENANCE ARREARAGE 
1/27/2012  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence  2/1/2012   
NOTE: AMENDED 
1/27/2012  STA - Statement  2/1/2012   
NOTE: JOINT PRE HEARING 
1/26/2012  STA - Statement  1/27/2012   
NOTE: JOINT PRE HEARING 
1/24/2012  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence  1/27/2012   
1/13/2012  LET - Letter  1/18/2012   
1/13/2012  LET - Letter  1/18/2012   
1/12/2012  NOT - Notice  1/17/2012   
NOTE: REQUIRING STRICT COMPLIANCE WITH THE ARIZONA RULES OF EVIDENCE 
1/3/2012  291 - ME: Mental Health Expert Appointment  1/3/2012   
12/22/2011  NOT - Notice  12/27/2011   
NOTE: PETITIONERS SUPPLEMENTAL LIST OF THERAPEUTIC SUPERVISORS 
12/19/2011  019 - ME: Ruling  12/19/2011   
12/16/2011  019 - ME: Ruling  12/16/2011   
12/13/2011  RES - Response  12/15/2011   
NOTE: PETITIONERS / TO RESPONDENTS NOTICE OF SUBMITTAL OF BLIND LIST OF THERAPEUTIC SUPERVISORS AND REQUEST TO ALLOW THE PARTIES TO SUPPLEMENT 
12/9/2011  MEM - Memorandum  12/13/2011   
NOTE: REPLY/ RE PETITIONERS OBJECTION TO RESPONDENTS REQUEST FOR JUDGMENT ON SP0USAL MAINTENANCE ARREARS 
12/8/2011  NOT - Notice  12/13/2011   
NOTE: OF SUBMITTAL OF BLIND LIST OF THERAPEUTIC SUPERVISORS 
12/6/2011  RES - Response  12/9/2011   
NOTE: TO RESPONDENTS OBJECTION TO THERAPUETIC SUPERVISORS RECOMMENDATION RE RELEASE OF VIDEO RECORDING 
11/23/2011  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  11/28/2011   
NOTE: PETITIONERS / TO RESPONDENTS REQUEST FOR JUDGMENT ON SPOUSAL MAINTENANCE ARREARS 
11/21/2011  089 - ME: Trial Setting  11/21/2011   
11/1/2011  ORD - Order  11/3/2011   
NOTE: WAIVING PETITIONERS APPEARANCE AT RETURN HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/07/2011 
11/1/2011  REQ - Request  11/3/2011   
NOTE: FOR JUDGMENT ON SPOUSAL MAINTENANCE ARREARAGES 
11/1/2011  RRO - Report Recommendation And Order  11/3/2011   
NOTE: THERAPEUTIC SUPERVISOR'S STATUS 
10/31/2011  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  11/4/2011   
NOTE: TO THERAPEUTIC SUPERVISORS RECOMMENDATION RE RELEASE OF VIDEO RECORDING 
10/28/2011  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  10/28/2011   
10/24/2011  MOT - Motion  10/26/2011   
NOTE: TO WAIVE PETITIONERS APPEARANCE AT RETURN HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/07/2011 
10/24/2011  003 - ME: Hearing Reset  10/24/2011   
10/20/2011  003 - ME: Hearing Reset  10/20/2011   
10/17/2011  RES - Response  10/19/2011   
NOTE: TO RESPONDENTS PETITION FOR ORDER TO APPEAR RE ENFORCEMENT OF DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND REQUEST TO VACATING HEARING 
10/14/2011  REP - Report  10/19/2011   
NOTE: THERAPEUTIC SUPERVISORS RECOMMENDATION REGARDING RELEASE OF VIDEO RECORDING 
10/6/2011  ACS - Acceptance Of Service  10/12/2011   
NOTE: NOTICE OF FILING 
9/30/2011  NOT - Notice  10/4/2011   
NOTE: OF CONFLICT 
9/15/2011  ORA - Order To Appear  9/21/2011   
NOTE: RE ENFORCEMENT OF THE DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE 
9/14/2011  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  9/14/2011   
9/12/2011  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  9/12/2011   
9/9/2011  RES - Response  9/13/2011   
NOTE: TO RESPONDENTS REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION OF REQUIREMENTS TO PARTICIPATE IN PSYCHIATRIC TREATMENT ET AL 
8/31/2011  COT - Petition For Contempt - Other  9/6/2011   
8/31/2011  REQ - Request  9/2/2011   
NOTE: FOR CLARIFICATION OF RESPONDENTS REQUIREMENTS TO PARTICIPATE IN PSYCHIATRIC TREATMENT GROUP THERAPY WITH DENNIS RYAN OR ANOTHER BEHAVIORAL HEALTH PROFESSIONAL AND ADDITIONAL COUNSELING FOR PERPETRATORS OF DOMESTIC VIOLENCE 
8/18/2011  RES - Response  8/22/2011   
NOTE: PETITIONERS / TO CUSTODY EVALUATORS REQUEST FOR ORDER RE SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM 
8/15/2011  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  8/17/2011   
NOTE: PETITIONERS / TO THERAPUETIC SUPERVISORS STATUS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS DATED 07/20/11 
8/15/2011  LET - Letter  8/17/2011   
NOTE: FROM CUSTODY EVALUATOR 
8/10/2011  019 - ME: Ruling  8/10/2011   
8/3/2011  REP - Report  8/5/2011   
NOTE: THERAPEUTIC SUPERVISORS STATUS / 
7/5/2011  REL - Reply  7/7/2011   
NOTE: PETITIONERS / TO RESPONDENTS RESPONSE TO THERAPEUTIC SUPERVISORS STATUS REPORT AND RESPONSE TO OBJECTION TO RECOMMENDATION FOR REAPPOINTMENT 
6/27/2011  RES - Response  6/28/2011   
NOTE: TO THERAPEUTIC SUPERVISORS STATUS REPORT AND OBJECTION TO RECOMMENDATION FOR REAPPOINTMENT FOR ONE YEAR 
6/27/2011  ORD - Order  6/29/2011   
NOTE: GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL 
6/10/2011  PCC - Parental Conflict Resolut Cert  6/14/2011   
NOTE: FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL WITH CONSENT 
5/12/2011  ASP - Affidavit Of Service Order Of Protection  5/13/2011   
NOTE: SERVED 5/11/11 
5/9/2011  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  5/9/2011   
5/6/2011  REP - Report  5/11/2011   
NOTE: THERAPEUTIC SUPERVISORS STATUS / 
5/5/2011  PPR - Praecipe For Order Protection  5/6/2011   
5/5/2011  OPR - Order Of Protection  5/6/2011   
5/5/2011  POP - Petition/Order Of Protection  5/6/2011  Petitioner 
3/30/2011  029 - ME: Status Conference  3/30/2011   
3/24/2011  REQ - Request  3/28/2011   
NOTE: THERAPEUTIC SUPERVISORS / FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING 
3/23/2011  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  3/23/2011   
3/15/2011  RES - Response  3/17/2011   
NOTE: TO THERAPEUTIC SUPERVISORS 03/09/2011 REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING 
3/1/2011  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  3/1/2011   
2/28/2011  REP - Report  3/4/2011   
NOTE: PARENTING COORDINATOR 
2/28/2011  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  2/28/2011   
2/24/2011  NOT - Notice  3/1/2011   
NOTE: OF WITHDRAWAL OF OBJECTION TO THERAPUETIC SUPERVISORS STATUS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS DATED 2/9/11 
2/24/2011  903 - ME: Judgment/Decree  2/24/2011   
2/23/2011  REP - Report  2/25/2011   
NOTE: THERAPEUTIC SUPERVISORS STATUS / 
2/16/2011  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  2/22/2011   
NOTE: TO THERAPUETIC SUPERVISORS STATUS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS DATED 2/9/11 
1/11/2011  259 – ME: Appointment of Parenting Coordinator  1/11/2011   
1/5/2011  REP - Report  1/10/2011   
NOTE: THERAPEUTIC SUPERVISORS STATUS 
1/3/2011  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  1/7/2011   
NOTE: TO RESPONDENTS AFIDAVIT FOR ATTY FEES AND REQUEST FOR CORRECTION OF 11/15/10 MINUTE ENTRY 
12/30/2010  NOL - Notice of Lodging  1/5/2011   
NOTE: PARENTING COORDINATOR NAMES 
12/21/2010  AFF - Affidavit  12/23/2010   
NOTE: OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS 
12/9/2010  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail  12/14/2010   
11/23/2010  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet  12/7/2010   
11/22/2010  903 - ME: Judgment/Decree  11/22/2010   
11/22/2010  OOA - Order Of Assignment / Restricted If Filed After 1/1/2006  11/22/2010   
NOTE:  
11/22/2010  OOA - Order Of Assignment / Restricted If Filed After 1/1/2006  11/22/2010   
NOTE:  
11/19/2010  PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support  12/1/2010   
10/6/2010  025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry  10/6/2010   
10/5/2010  STA - Statement  10/13/2010   
NOTE: THERAPEUTIC SUPERVISORS/OF INFORMATION 
9/27/2010  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset  9/27/2010   
9/27/2010  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  9/27/2010   
9/20/2010  LET - Letter  9/24/2010   
9/17/2010  STA - Statement  9/22/2010   
NOTE: JOINT PRETRIAL 
9/15/2010  MAT - Motion to Appear Telephonically  9/17/2010   
NOTE: ACCELERATED/ 
9/14/2010  MAT - Motion to Appear Telephonically  9/20/2010   
9/14/2010  MOT - Motion  9/20/2010   
NOTE: TO ALLOW IN CAMERA APPEARANCE OF WITNESS 
9/14/2010  OAT - Order To Appear By Telephone  9/21/2010   
NOTE: OF WITNESS 
9/13/2010  AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06  9/17/2010   
NOTE: UPDATED 
9/8/2010  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  9/13/2010   
NOTE: TO THERAPEUTIC SUPERVISORS REPORT 
9/7/2010  REP - Report  9/13/2010   
NOTE: THERAPEUTIC SUPERVISORS STATUS 
9/7/2010  REQ - Request  9/10/2010   
NOTE: FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE OF WITNESS 
9/7/2010  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence  9/13/2010   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL 
9/5/2010  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  9/13/2010   
NOTE: ADDITIONAL/TO RESPONDENTS EXHIBITS 
8/27/2010  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence  9/1/2010   
NOTE: PETITIONERS 4TH SUPPLEMENTAL 
8/24/2010  LET - Letter  8/31/2010   
8/2/2010  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  8/2/2010   
7/21/2010  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  7/21/2010   
7/21/2010  019 - ME: Ruling  7/21/2010   
7/15/2010  RES - Response  7/19/2010   
NOTE: TO THERAPEUTIC SUPERVISORS REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION REGARDING FEE SPLIT 
7/15/2010  MTO - Motion for Temporary Orders  7/19/2010   
NOTE: RE ACCESS TO COMMUNITY FUNDS/PARENTING TIME AND PAYMENT OF ATTORNEYS FEES 
6/11/2010  ASP - Affidavit Of Service Order Of Protection  6/11/2010   
NOTE: SERVED 5/30/10 
5/17/2010  ORD - Order  5/26/2010   
NOTE: TO APPOINT A THERAPEUTIC SUPERVISOR 
5/17/2010  REQ - Request  5/26/2010   
NOTE: FOR SUBSTITUTE THERAPEUTIC SUPERVISOR 
5/13/2010  PPR - Praecipe For Order Protection  5/14/2010   
5/13/2010  OPR - Order Of Protection  5/14/2010   
5/13/2010  POP - Petition/Order Of Protection  5/14/2010  Petitioner 
5/10/2010  029 - ME: Status Conference  5/10/2010   
5/10/2010  REP - Report  5/14/2010   
NOTE: HUMAN RESOURCE TRAINING INC/PARENTING SKILLS PROGRAM/ADMINISTRATION CALL LOG 
5/10/2010  NOT - Notice  5/14/2010   
NOTE: BASIC SUPERVISED VISITATION FORM 
5/10/2010  NOT - Notice  5/14/2010   
NOTE: BASIC SUPERVISED VISITATION FORM 
5/10/2010  NOT - Notice  5/14/2010   
NOTE: BASIC SUPERVISED VISITATION FORM 
5/10/2010  NOT - Notice  5/14/2010   
NOTE: BASIC SUPERVISED VISITATION FORM 
5/10/2010  NOT - Notice  5/14/2010   
NOTE: BASIC SUPERVISED VISITATION FORM 
5/10/2010  NOT - Notice  5/14/2010   
NOTE: BASIC SUPERVISED VISITATION FORM 
5/10/2010  NOT - Notice  5/14/2010   
NOTE: BASIC SUPERVISED VISITATION FORM 
5/10/2010  NOT - Notice  5/14/2010   
NOTE: BASIC SUPERVISED VISITATION FORM 
5/10/2010  NOT - Notice  5/14/2010   
NOTE: BASIC SUPERVISED VISITATION FORM 
5/10/2010  NOT - Notice  5/14/2010   
NOTE: BASIC SUPERVISED VISITATION FORM 
5/10/2010  NOT - Notice  5/14/2010   
NOTE: BASIC SUPERVISED VISITATION FORM 
5/6/2010  029 - ME: Status Conference  5/6/2010   
5/5/2010  RES - Response  5/11/2010   
NOTE: TO MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL 
5/4/2010  MCO - Motion To Continue  5/7/2010   
NOTE: TRIAL 
5/4/2010  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  5/4/2010   
5/3/2010  025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry  5/3/2010   
5/3/2010  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence  5/12/2010   
NOTE: 3RD SUPPLEMENTAL 
5/3/2010  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  5/12/2010   
NOTE: TO RESPONDENTS EXHIBITS 
5/3/2010  SDO - Order to Seal Documents  5/27/2010   
NOTE: REPORT OF THE CUSTODY EVALUATOR 
5/3/2010  OAT - Order To Appear By Telephone  5/12/2010   
NOTE: FOR WITNESSES 
4/30/2010  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence  5/6/2010   
4/30/2010  AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06  5/5/2010   
NOTE: AMENDED 
4/29/2010  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence  5/5/2010   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL 
4/29/2010  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence  5/5/2010   
NOTE: 2ND SUPPLEMENTAL 
4/29/2010  REQ - Request  5/6/2010   
NOTE: FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE OF WITNESSES 
4/28/2010  029 - ME: Status Conference  4/28/2010   
4/27/2010  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence  5/3/2010   
NOTE: AMENDED 
4/20/2010  041 - ME: Scheduling Conference Set  4/20/2010   
4/15/2010  LET - Letter  4/19/2010   
NOTE: PAULETTE SELMI PHD 
4/14/2010  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence  4/19/2010   
4/12/2010  019 - ME: Ruling  4/12/2010   
4/9/2010  MEM - Memorandum  4/14/2010   
4/9/2010  REQ - Request  4/14/2010   
NOTE: FOR ADDITIONAL TRIAL TIME 
4/1/2010  RES - Response  4/2/2010   
NOTE: TO RESPONDENTS MOTION FOR INTERIM AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES 
3/24/2010  RES - Response  3/26/2010   
NOTE: TO EXPEDITED SECOND MOTION FOR NEW SUPERVISED VISITATION LOCATION OR TO CEASE VISITATION 
3/24/2010  MOT - Motion  3/30/2010   
NOTE: FOR INTERIM AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES 
3/16/2010  MOT - Motion  3/22/2010   
NOTE: EXPEDITED SECOND/FOR NEW SUPERVISED VISITATION LOCATION OR TO CEASE VISITATION 
3/4/2010  REQ - Request  3/9/2010   
NOTE: FOR ADDITIONAL TRIAL TIME 
2/2/2010  029 - ME: Status Conference  2/2/2010   
1/21/2010  ORD - Order  1/25/2010   
NOTE: TO RELEASE RECORDS 
1/20/2010  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  1/20/2010   
1/15/2010  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  1/15/2010   
1/12/2010  RES - Response  1/14/2010   
NOTE: TO MOTION FOR EMERGENCY TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE PARENTING TIME 
1/7/2010  LET - Letter  1/22/2010   
1/5/2010  MOT - Motion  1/6/2010   
NOTE: FOR EMERGENCY TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE: PARENTING TIME 
12/21/2009  MSE - Motion To Set & Cert/Readiness  12/22/2009   
12/18/2009  700 - ME: Resolution Management Conference Set  12/18/2009   
12/11/2009  REL - Reply  12/23/2009   
NOTE: TO RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF CHANGE OF JUDGE 
12/10/2009  RES - Response  12/15/2009   
NOTE: TO EXPEDITED MOTION FOR NEW SUPERVISED VISITATION LOCATION OR TO CEASE VISITATION/MOTION FOR CONTEMPT RE NON-COMPLIANCE WITH TEMPORARY ORDERS 
12/10/2009  RTC - Response To Complaint/Answer  12/11/2009   
NOTE: AMENDED 
12/8/2009  RES - Response  12/11/2009   
NOTE: TO NOTICE OF CHANGE OF JUDGE 
12/7/2009  OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel  12/9/2009   
12/3/2009  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  12/7/2009   
12/2/2009  ORD - Order  12/7/2009   
NOTE: RE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN 
12/1/2009  AMC - Amended Complaint  12/4/2009   
11/30/2009  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  12/1/2009   
11/30/2009  NJR - Notice of change of Judge for right  12/10/2009   
11/24/2009  MOT - Motion  11/27/2009   
NOTE: EXPEDITED/FOR NEW SUPERVISED VISITATION LOCATION OR TO CEASE VISITATION 
11/23/2009  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel  11/24/2009   
NOTE: FOR RESPONDENT 
11/9/2009  REP - Report  11/12/2009   
NOTE: CHILD CUSTODY EVALUATION 
11/5/2009  MOT - Motion  11/9/2009   
NOTE: FOR LEAVE TO AMEND PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN 
9/22/2009  ORD - Order  9/23/2009   
NOTE: RE SUBSTITUION OF COUNSEL WITH CONSENT 
9/16/2009  STP - Stipulation  9/18/2009   
NOTE: FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL OF RECORD WITH OCNSENT 
9/1/2009  291 - ME: Mental Health Expert Appointment  9/1/2009   
8/26/2009  STP - Stipulation  8/31/2009   
NOTE: TO APPOINT CUSTODY EVALUATOR 
8/25/2009  RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail  8/27/2009   
8/21/2009  019 - ME: Ruling  8/21/2009   
8/21/2009  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  8/21/2009   
8/20/2009  ORD - Order  8/21/2009   
NOTE: FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL 
8/14/2009  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated  8/14/2009   
8/12/2009  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  8/12/2009   
8/7/2009  NOT - Notice  8/17/2009   
NOTE: OF WITHDRAWING REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE 
8/6/2009  REQ - Request  8/12/2009   
NOTE: EXPEDITED/FOR TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE 
8/5/2009  OOA - Order Of Assignment / Restricted If Filed After 1/1/2006  8/5/2009   
NOTE:  
8/4/2009  APL - Application  8/10/2009   
NOTE: FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL 
8/3/2009  OOA - Order Of Assignment / Restricted If Filed After 1/1/2006  8/3/2009   
NOTE:  
7/31/2009  RES - Response  8/6/2009   
NOTE: TO LEGAL MEMORANDUM RE: RULE 63 PSYCHIATRIC EVALUATION 
7/31/2009  RES - Response  8/6/2009   
NOTE: TO MOTION FOR INTERVIEW OF MINOR CHLD BY CONCILIATION SERVICES 
7/29/2009  OOA - Order Of Assignment / Restricted If Filed After 1/1/2006  7/29/2009   
NOTE:  
7/27/2009  019 - ME: Ruling  7/27/2009   
7/24/2009  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet  8/3/2009   
7/23/2009  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  7/23/2009   
7/22/2009  WSH - Worksheet  7/29/2009   
NOTE: TRIAL/HEARING 
7/21/2009  MEM - Memorandum  7/28/2009   
NOTE: LEGAL / RE RULE 63 PSYCHIATRIC EVALUATION OF RESPONDENT 
7/21/2009  ORD - Order  7/23/2009   
NOTE: SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL 
7/20/2009  STA - Statement  7/23/2009   
NOTE: JOINT PRETRIAL 
7/17/2009  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence  7/22/2009   
NOTE: 2ND SUPPLEMENTAL 
7/17/2009  MOT - Motion  7/27/2009   
NOTE: FOR INTERVIEW OF MINOR CHILD BY CONCILIATION SERVICES 
7/16/2009  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence  7/27/2009   
7/16/2009  STP - Stipulation  7/27/2009   
NOTE: FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL 
7/16/2009  PEC - Parent Education Certificate  7/23/2009   
NOTE: NOTICE OF FILING/ RESPONDENT ATTENDED 
7/16/2009  ORD - Order  7/17/2009   
NOTE: FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL 
7/15/2009  AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06  7/20/2009   
NOTE: NOTICE OF FILING UPDATED / 
7/14/2009  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence  7/21/2009   
NOTE: 1ST SUPPLEMENTAL 
7/10/2009  STP - Stipulation  7/17/2009   
NOTE: FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL 
7/8/2009  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence  7/10/2009   
7/8/2009  ORD - Order  7/15/2009   
NOTE: CONFIDENTIALITY 
7/7/2009  STP - Stipulation  7/8/2009   
NOTE: RE: CONFIDENTIAL FINANCIAL AND BUSINESS RECORDS 
6/30/2009  PEC - Parent Education Certificate  7/1/2009   
NOTE: PETITIONER ATTENDED 
6/15/2009  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset  6/15/2009   
6/2/2009  AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06  6/5/2009   
6/2/2009  MOT - Motion  6/8/2009   
NOTE: FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS RE DIVISION OF COMMUNITY PROPERTY/SPOUSAL MAINTENANCE AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS 
6/2/2009  MOT - Motion  6/8/2009   
NOTE: TO EXPEDITE HEARING ON HUSBANDS MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS 
6/2/2009  NLR – Notice Of Limited Scope Representation  6/3/2009   
6/2/2009  NLR – Notice Of Limited Scope Representation  6/3/2009   
6/2/2009  ANS - Answer  6/3/2009   
5/28/2009  089 - ME: Trial Setting  5/28/2009   
5/27/2009  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  6/4/2009   
NOTE: SERVED 05/14/09 
5/19/2009  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  5/27/2009   
NOTE: SERVED 5-14-2009 
5/14/2009  ORA - Order To Appear  5/20/2009   
NOTE: TEMPORARY ORDERS WITHOUT NOTICE 
5/13/2009  ORD - Order  5/21/2009   
NOTE: RE EX-PARTE EMERGENCY MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS 
5/12/2009  COM - Complaint  5/19/2009   
5/12/2009  SUM - Summons  5/19/2009   
5/12/2009  PIN - Preliminary Injunction  5/19/2009   
5/12/2009  ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf  5/19/2009   
5/12/2009  NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins  5/19/2009   
5/12/2009  NOT - Notice  5/19/2009   
NOTE: REGARDING CREDITORS 
5/12/2009  AFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children  5/19/2009   
5/12/2009  MOT - Motion  5/19/2009   
NOTE: FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS 
5/12/2009  AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06  5/19/2009   
5/12/2009  MOT - Motion  5/19/2009   
NOTE: EMERGENCY EX PARTE/ FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS WIHTOUT NOTICE 
5/12/2009  SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access  5/19/2009   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
5/27/20099:30  Emergency Hearing 
7/21/200913:30  Trial/Evidentiary Hearing 
8/24/200911:00  Status Conference 
8/24/200913:30  Trial/Evidentiary Hearing 
1/22/201015:00  Status Conference 
3/12/201014:30  Resolution Management Conference 
4/21/201014:30  Status Conference 
4/30/201010:30  Status Conference 
5/5/20109:45  Status Conference 
5/6/20109:00  Trial/Evidentiary Hearing 
5/21/201013:30  Trial Continuing 
9/20/20109:00  Trial/Evidentiary Hearing 
9/21/20109:00  Trial Continuing 
3/22/201110:00  Status Conference 
10/19/201110:30  Return 
11/7/201111:00  Return 
1/31/201216:00  Trial/Evidentiary Hearing 
7/9/20128:30  Order Of Protection Hearing 
7/10/201210:00  Objection 
7/13/20128:30  Order Of Protection Hearing 
9/11/20129:30  Objection 
11/7/20128:30  Return 
11/13/201211:00  Return 
1/29/20139:00  Trial/Evidentiary Hearing 
8/15/20139:30  Oral Argument 
11/26/201313:30  Status Conference 
12/5/201310:30  Status Conference 
1/23/201415:00  Oral Argument 
4/1/201414:30  Oral Argument 
8/18/201414:00  Resolution Management Conference 


click here for Law Library Resource Center