Family Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | FC2007-008143 | Judge: | Francis, Jillian |
File Date: | 10/17/2007 | Location: | Northwest |
Case Type: | Family Court With Children |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Todd Jostes | Petitioner | Female | Jared Simmons |
Cami Jostes | Respondent | Male | Pro Per |
Dept Of Economic Security (DES) | Intervenor | Arathi Premkumar |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
7/8/2019 | AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006 | 7/9/2019 | |
9/5/2018 | AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006 | 9/7/2018 | |
2/20/2018 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 2/20/2018 | |
1/12/2018 | AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006 | 1/16/2018 | |
12/11/2017 | 256 - ME: Iv-D Hearing | 12/11/2017 | |
10/2/2017 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set | 10/2/2017 | |
7/27/2017 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set | 7/27/2017 | |
6/15/2017 | RNM - Returned Mail | 6/15/2017 | |
NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry | |||
6/1/2017 | 256 - ME: Iv-D Hearing | 6/1/2017 | |
5/16/2017 | RNM - Returned Mail | 5/16/2017 | |
NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry | |||
5/2/2017 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set | 5/2/2017 | |
4/26/2017 | CSW - Child Support Arrest Warrant | 4/27/2017 | |
NOTE: CHILD SUPPORT ARREST WARRANT Quashed 2017-04-26 | |||
4/20/2017 | RNM - Returned Mail | 4/20/2017 | |
NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry | |||
4/6/2017 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 4/6/2017 | |
3/29/2017 | RNM - Returned Mail | 3/29/2017 | |
NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry | |||
3/21/2017 | MFR - Motion For Reconsideration | 3/22/2017 | |
NOTE: Petitioners Amended Motion for Reconsideration re Minute Entry of March 14, 2017 Issuing Child Support Arrest Warrant | |||
3/20/2017 | RNM - Returned Mail | 3/20/2017 | |
NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry | |||
3/20/2017 | MFR - Motion For Reconsideration | 3/21/2017 | |
NOTE: Petitioners Motion for Reconsideration re Minute Entry of March 14, 2017 Issuing Child Support Arrest Warrant | |||
3/16/2017 | 265 - ME: Child/Support Arrest Warrant Issued | 3/16/2017 | |
3/14/2017 | IWA – Issuance of Warrant | 3/15/2017 | |
NOTE: Issued 2017-03-14 | |||
3/2/2017 | 256 - ME: Iv-D Hearing | 3/2/2017 | |
2/28/2017 | CSW - Child Support Arrest Warrant | 3/1/2017 | |
NOTE: SERVED 02/04/2017 | |||
2/27/2017 | RNM - Returned Mail | 2/27/2017 | |
NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry | |||
2/13/2017 | 266 - ME: Quash/Ret C/Sup Arrest Warr | 2/13/2017 | |
10/18/2016 | 265 - ME: Child/Support Arrest Warrant Issued | 10/18/2016 | |
10/14/2016 | IWA – Issuance of Warrant | 10/17/2016 | |
NOTE: CHILD SUPPORT ARREST WARRANT Issued 2016-10-14 | |||
8/25/2016 | IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access | 8/25/2016 | |
NOTE: | |||
8/23/2016 | 253 - Stop/Mod OOA IWO granted | 8/23/2016 | |
8/18/2016 | UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name | 8/22/2016 | Petitioner |
8/18/2016 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 8/23/2016 | |
8/8/2016 | NOT - Notice | 8/9/2016 | Petitioner |
NOTE: CHILD SUPPORT | |||
7/26/2016 | CSW - Child Support Arrest Warrant | 7/27/2016 | |
7/19/2016 | RNM - Returned Mail | 7/19/2016 | |
NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry | |||
7/7/2016 | 266 - ME: Quash/Ret C/Sup Arrest Warr | 7/7/2016 | |
7/6/2016 | REC - Receipt | 7/7/2016 | |
7/6/2016 | CSW - Child Support Arrest Warrant | 7/6/2016 | |
NOTE: Quashed 2016-07-06 | |||
3/23/2016 | RNM - Returned Mail | 3/23/2016 | |
NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry | |||
3/15/2016 | 265 - ME: Child/Support Arrest Warrant Issued | 3/15/2016 | |
3/11/2016 | RNM - Returned Mail | 3/11/2016 | |
NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry | |||
3/10/2016 | IWA – Issuance of Warrant | 3/10/2016 | |
NOTE: CHILD SUPPORT ARREST WARRANT Issued 2016-03-10 | |||
3/10/2016 | RNM - Returned Mail | 3/10/2016 | |
NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry | |||
2/26/2016 | NAC - Notice Providing Arrears Calculation | 2/29/2016 | |
2/17/2016 | 255 - ME: Contempt Hearing | 2/17/2016 | |
2/12/2016 | NOT - Notice | 2/16/2016 | |
NOTE: UNREIMBURSED MEDICAL DENTAL & VISION CARE EXPENSES | |||
1/27/2016 | RNM - Returned Mail | 1/27/2016 | |
NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry | |||
1/27/2016 | RNM - Returned Mail | 1/27/2016 | |
NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry | |||
1/12/2016 | 266 - ME: Quash/Ret C/Sup Arrest Warr | 1/12/2016 | |
1/11/2016 | REC - Receipt | 1/12/2016 | |
1/11/2016 | 265 - ME: Child/Support Arrest Warrant Issued | 1/11/2016 | |
1/11/2016 | CSW - Child Support Arrest Warrant | 1/11/2016 | |
NOTE: Quashed 2016-01-11 | |||
1/7/2016 | IWA – Issuance of Warrant | 1/7/2016 | |
NOTE: Issued 2016-01-07 | |||
11/23/2015 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 11/24/2015 | Petitioner |
11/6/2015 | ORA - Order To Appear | 11/6/2015 | |
NOTE: REGARDING ENFORCEMENT OF UNREIMBURSED MEDICAL/DENTAL/VISION EXPENSES AND SUPPORT | |||
11/4/2015 | SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access | 11/5/2015 | Respondent |
11/4/2015 | ESE - Expedited Request To Enforce Support | 11/5/2015 | Respondent |
NOTE: CHILD SUPPORT/CHILD SUPPORT ARREARS/SPOUSAL MAINTENANCE/SPOUSAL MAINTENANCE ARREARS/MEDICAL INSURANCE COVERAGE/MEDICAL EXPENSE REIMBURSEMENT | |||
11/4/2015 | CEI - Current Employer Information | 11/5/2015 | |
6/26/2012 | DEW - Disposition Of Exhibit Worksheet | 7/10/2012 | |
3/16/2012 | LED - 2.8 (d) Letter | 3/22/2012 | |
5/18/2010 | RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail | 5/24/2010 | |
4/26/2010 | 002 - ME: Hearing Vacated | 4/26/2010 | |
3/5/2010 | RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail | 3/9/2010 | |
2/18/2010 | IVE - Intervenor Fee | 2/26/2010 | |
2/18/2010 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 2/26/2010 | |
NOTE: STATES | |||
2/10/2010 | OSO = Order stopping order of assignment IWO | 2/10/2010 | |
NOTE: | |||
2/4/2010 | OOA - Order Of Assignment / Restricted If Filed After 1/1/2006 | 2/4/2010 | |
NOTE: | |||
11/18/2009 | OOA - Order Of Assignment / Restricted If Filed After 1/1/2006 | 11/18/2009 | |
NOTE: | |||
11/6/2009 | 903 - ME: Judgment/Decree | 11/6/2009 | |
10/30/2009 | UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name | 10/30/2009 | Petitioner |
10/28/2009 | CEI - Current Employer Information | 11/2/2009 | |
10/28/2009 | APM - Affidavit of Direct Payment | 11/2/2009 | Respondent |
10/23/2009 | OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel | 10/28/2009 | |
9/23/2009 | NWA - Notice Of Withdrawal Of Attorney | 9/24/2009 | |
9/21/2009 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 9/29/2009 | |
NOTE: SERVED 09/19/09 | |||
9/8/2009 | COA - Order To Appear For Conference | 9/8/2009 | |
9/4/2009 | ESE - Expedited Request To Enforce Support | 9/16/2009 | Respondent |
3/3/2009 | JOR - Judgment And Order | 3/10/2009 | |
NOTE: Judgment and Order: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties | |||
3/3/2009 | APM - Affidavit of Direct Payment | 3/10/2009 | |
2/2/2009 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 2/10/2009 | |
NOTE: SERVED 1/30/09 | |||
1/15/2009 | COA - Order To Appear For Conference | 1/15/2009 | |
1/14/2009 | CME - Credit Memo | 1/16/2009 | |
NOTE: RESPONDENT $20.00 | |||
1/14/2009 | ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver | 1/16/2009 | Respondent |
1/14/2009 | ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees | 1/16/2009 | |
1/14/2009 | ESE - Expedited Request To Enforce Support | 1/16/2009 | Respondent |
1/5/2009 | OOA - Order Of Assignment / Restricted If Filed After 1/1/2006 | 1/5/2009 | |
NOTE: | |||
12/31/2008 | CDS - Consent Decree | 1/2/2009 | |
NOTE: Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing | |||
12/31/2008 | CEI - Current Employer Information | 1/2/2009 | |
12/15/2008 | 078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar | 12/15/2008 | |
12/1/2008 | NOS - Notice Of Settlement | 12/2/2008 | |
11/19/2008 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 11/19/2008 | |
11/13/2008 | NOT - Notice | 11/14/2008 | |
NOTE: OF SERVICE | |||
10/30/2008 | AAF - Application For Attorney Fees | 11/4/2008 | |
NOTE: EMERGENCY MOTION FOR RETURN OF PERSONAL PROPERTY | |||
10/24/2008 | MCO - Motion To Continue | 10/28/2008 | |
NOTE: / TRIAL | |||
10/23/2008 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 10/23/2008 | |
10/20/2008 | OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel | 10/22/2008 | |
10/17/2008 | RES - Response | 10/17/2008 | Respondent |
NOTE: TO MOTION FOR CONTEMPT FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH PARENTING TIME ORDERS | |||
10/17/2008 | NOT - Notice | 10/20/2008 | |
NOTE: OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR CONTEMPT FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH PARENTING TIME ORDERS | |||
10/7/2008 | MOT - Motion | 10/9/2008 | |
NOTE: TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORENY OF RECORD WITH CLIENT CONSENT | |||
10/3/2008 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 10/3/2008 | |
9/26/2008 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 9/26/2008 | |
9/26/2008 | MOT - Motion | 9/29/2008 | |
NOTE: FOR CONTEMPT FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH PARENTING TIME ORDERS | |||
9/26/2008 | REL - Reply | 9/30/2008 | |
NOTE: HUSBANDS / IN SUPPORT OF EMERGENCY MOTION FOR RETURN OF PERSONAL PROPERTY | |||
9/22/2008 | RES - Response | 9/24/2008 | |
NOTE: ADDENDUM TO / TO EMERGENCY MOTION FOR RETURN OF PERSONAL PROPERTY MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION | |||
9/22/2008 | RES - Response | 9/24/2008 | |
NOTE: HUSBANDS / TO MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION | |||
9/18/2008 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 9/18/2008 | |
9/11/2008 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 9/11/2008 | |
9/11/2008 | RES - Response | 9/12/2008 | |
NOTE: TO EMERGENCY MOTION FOR RETURN OF PERSONAL PROPERTY/MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION | |||
9/9/2008 | EXH - Exhibit | 9/10/2008 | |
NOTE: FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL/IN SUPPORT OF THE EMERGENCY MOTION FOR RETURN OF PERSONAL PROPERTY | |||
8/22/2008 | MOT - Motion | 8/26/2008 | |
NOTE: EMERGENCY/FOR RETURN OF PERSONAL PROPERTY | |||
6/25/2008 | 049 - ME: Judgment Signed | 6/25/2008 | |
6/23/2008 | JFF - Judgment For Fees | 6/25/2008 | |
NOTE: Judgment for Fees: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties | |||
5/30/2008 | RES - Response | 6/2/2008 | |
NOTE: TO APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS | |||
5/14/2008 | AAF - Application For Attorney Fees | 5/15/2008 | |
5/9/2008 | 089 - ME: Trial Setting | 5/9/2008 | |
4/29/2008 | EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet | 5/14/2008 | |
4/29/2008 | WSH - Worksheet | 5/2/2008 | |
NOTE: TRIAL/HEARING | |||
4/29/2008 | PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support | 5/5/2008 | |
4/22/2008 | LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence | 4/24/2008 | |
2/14/2008 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document | 2/25/2008 | |
NOTE: PARENTING CONFERENCE REPORT DATED JANUARY 31, 2008 | |||
12/11/2007 | RTC - Response To Complaint/Answer | 12/13/2007 | |
12/11/2007 | AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06 | 12/13/2007 | |
12/11/2007 | RES - Response | 12/13/2007 | |
NOTE: TO MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS | |||
12/6/2007 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set | 12/6/2007 | |
12/3/2007 | OCO - Order Attend Conciliation Srvs | 12/6/2007 | |
11/26/2007 | STA - Statement | 11/29/2007 | |
NOTE: PROPOSED RESOLUTION / OF HUSBAND | |||
11/15/2007 | 700 - ME: Resolution Management Conference Set | 11/15/2007 | |
11/13/2007 | PEC - Parent Education Certificate | 11/15/2007 | |
NOTE: RESPONDENT ATTENDED | |||
11/13/2007 | ANS - Answer | 11/27/2007 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |||
10/30/2007 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 11/1/2007 | |
NOTE: SERVED 10/20/07 | |||
10/29/2007 | MOT - Motion | 10/31/2007 | |
NOTE: FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS | |||
10/17/2007 | COM - Complaint | 10/19/2007 | |
10/17/2007 | PIN - Preliminary Injunction | 10/19/2007 | |
10/17/2007 | NOT - Notice | 10/19/2007 | |
NOTE: RE STRICT COMPLIANCE | |||
10/17/2007 | NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins | 10/19/2007 | |
10/17/2007 | SUM - Summons | 10/19/2007 | |
10/17/2007 | ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf | 10/19/2007 |
Case Calendar | |||
---|---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event | |
11/28/2007 | 8:30 | Temporary Orders | |
1/22/2008 | 10:00 | Parenting Conference | |
1/24/2008 | 12:00 | Child Interview | |
4/29/2008 | 9:00 | Temporary Orders | |
12/3/2008 | 9:00 | Trial/Evidentiary Hearing | |
3/3/2009 | 8:30 | Enforcement Conference | |
3/3/2009 | 9:45 | Enforcement Evidentiary Hearing | |
10/28/2009 | 9:45 | Enforcement Conference | |
10/28/2009 | 11:00 | Enforcement Evidentiary Hearing | |
4/19/2010 | 13:30 | Review Hearing | |
1/7/2016 | 13:30 | IV-D Enforcement of Support | |
2/11/2016 | 14:00 | Review Hearing | |
3/10/2016 | 9:00 | Review Hearing | |
8/18/2016 | 10:30 | Review Hearing | |
10/10/2016 | 13:15 | Orientation | |
2/5/2017 | 20:00 | Initial Appearance | |
2/10/2017 | 14:00 | Return | |
2/28/2017 | 13:30 | Accountability Court | |
4/6/2017 | 15:00 | Review Hearing | |
5/25/2017 | 9:00 | Review Hearing | |
7/20/2017 | 10:00 | Review Hearing | |
9/21/2017 | 9:00 | Review Hearing | |
11/30/2017 | 9:00 | Review Hearing | |
2/8/2018 | 9:00 | Review Hearing |