« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FC2006-004834
Judge:
Zabor, Melissa
File Date:
6/12/2006
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Family Court With Children
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Kent Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Gregory Larson
Party Name
Sherri Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2006
Description
042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full
Docket Date
12/15/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2006
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/2/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXTENDING TIME FOR SERVICE OF THE PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION
Filing Date
9/18/2006
Description
MXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service
Docket Date
9/20/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF THE PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION
Filing Date
6/12/2006
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
6/26/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/2006
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
6/26/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/2006
Description
ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf
Docket Date
6/26/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/2006
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
6/26/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/2006
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
6/26/2006
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
12/12/2006
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference