« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FC2004-001078
Judge:
Williams, Paula
File Date:
2/3/2004
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Family Court With Children
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
(1)Dept Of Economic Security (DES)
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Attorney
Lisa Maxie-Mullins
Party Name
Nichole Jean Crile
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Timothy Eugene Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/2023
Description
SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment
Docket Date
12/18/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SATISFACTION OF SUPPORT JUDGMENT AND RELEASE OF LIEN
Filing Date
2/13/2020
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
2/13/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2019
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
5/10/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/12/2019
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
3/12/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/2/2010
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
11/12/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/13/2010
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
1/13/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/9/2008
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
6/9/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/29/2008
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
2/29/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/10/2007
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
10/16/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2006
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
5/24/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2006
Description
AOA - Administrative Order Of Assign
Docket Date
1/31/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESTRICTED ACCESS
Filing Date
8/11/2005
Description
AOA - Administrative Order Of Assign
Docket Date
8/24/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2004
Description
AOA - Administrative Order Of Assign
Docket Date
12/1/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2004
Description
OOA - Order Of Assignment
Docket Date
10/25/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
AUTOMATIC/AFTER HEARING
Filing Date
10/15/2004
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
11/2/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2004
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
10/19/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2004
Description
EJS - Judgment/Order Establishment Stipulation
Docket Date
10/18/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
Certified Copy Establishment Judgment/Order by Stipulation; reflect date of filing sent to parties by Attorney General’s Office
Filing Date
9/30/2004
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
10/19/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2004
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
10/19/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2004
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
10/19/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2004
Description
049 - ME: Judgment Signed
Docket Date
7/16/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/2004
Description
JOR - Judgment And Order
Docket Date
7/23/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
Judgment and Order: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties
Filing Date
6/11/2004
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
6/21/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
6/11/2004
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
6/21/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND REQUEST FOR SUPPORT HEARING
Filing Date
5/18/2004
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
6/1/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
GENETIC TEST RESULTS
Filing Date
4/29/2004
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/6/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 02/18/04
Filing Date
4/15/2004
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/11/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR GENETIC TESTING
Filing Date
3/23/2004
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/11/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR GENETIC TESTING
Filing Date
2/3/2004
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
2/5/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2004
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/5/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2004
Description
ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf
Docket Date
2/5/2004
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
9/27/2004
Time
10:30
Event
Establishment Hearing