« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FC2003-092375
Judge:
Gnepper, Gregory
File Date:
6/9/2003
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Family Court With Children
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Stefanie M Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Darren E Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/2009
Description
OOA - Order Of Assignment / Restricted If Filed After 1/1/2006
Docket Date
8/26/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
8/26/2009
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
8/31/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/2008
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
11/7/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/3/2008
Description
OOA - Order Of Assignment / Restricted If Filed After 1/1/2006
Docket Date
11/3/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
9/16/2008
Description
OOA - Order Of Assignment / Restricted If Filed After 1/1/2006
Docket Date
9/16/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
9/16/2008
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
9/17/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/23/2004
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
8/6/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2004
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
5/11/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2004
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
2/27/2004
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/10/2003
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
4/24/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2003
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
12/1/2003
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
11/13/2003
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
12/1/2003
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
11/12/2003
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
11/18/2003
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
11/7/2003
Description
DFS - Default Decree
Docket Date
11/20/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing
Filing Date
11/7/2003
Description
JCP - Joint Custody Plan
Docket Date
1/29/2004
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/7/2003
Description
OOA - Order Of Assignment
Docket Date
2/18/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2003
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
2/18/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/10/2003
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
10/20/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/15/2003
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
8/18/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/12/2003
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
8/19/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/2003
Description
OCS - Order For Child Support
Docket Date
9/23/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/2003
Description
OOA - Order Of Assignment
Docket Date
10/6/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/18/2003
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
8/15/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF PATERNITY
Filing Date
7/18/2003
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
7/21/2003
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
7/18/2003
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
7/21/2003
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
RESPONDENT ATTENDED
Filing Date
7/14/2003
Description
CSI - Child Support Information Form
Docket Date
8/5/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
AMENDED /
Filing Date
7/14/2003
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
7/17/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
OF PETITIONER
Filing Date
6/10/2003
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
6/18/2003
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
6/9/2003
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
6/11/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/9/2003
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
6/11/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/9/2003
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
6/11/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/9/2003
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
6/11/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/9/2003
Description
AFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children
Docket Date
6/11/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/9/2003
Description
CSI - Child Support Information Form
Docket Date
6/11/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/9/2003
Description
ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf
Docket Date
6/11/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
11/7/2003
Time
13:30
Event
Default Hearing