« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FC2003-012065
Judge:
Drake, Jim
File Date:
10/21/2003
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Family Court With Children
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
(1)Dept Of Economic Security (DES)
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Attorney
Julia Smock
Party Name
Delphina Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Irin Lashun Daniels
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2010
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
5/28/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2009
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
1/22/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/2007
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
2/2/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/2005
Description
AOA - Administrative Order Of Assign
Docket Date
8/22/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2005
Description
AOA - Administrative Order Of Assign
Docket Date
5/12/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2005
Description
AOA - Administrative Order Of Assign
Docket Date
3/24/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/9/2004
Description
AOA - Administrative Order Of Assign
Docket Date
11/23/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2004
Description
AOA - Administrative Order Of Assign
Docket Date
9/3/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2004
Description
AOA - Administrative Order Of Assign
Docket Date
6/11/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2004
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
4/21/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/24/2004
Description
EJS - Judgment/Order Establishment Stipulation
Docket Date
4/13/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
Certified Copy Establishment Judgment/Order by Stipulation; reflect date of filing sent to parties by Attorney General’s Office
Filing Date
3/24/2004
Description
OOA - Order Of Assignment
Docket Date
4/16/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
AUTOMATIC/AFTER HEARING
Filing Date
3/24/2004
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
7/8/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2004
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
4/16/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2004
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
5/12/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/14/2004
Description
SES - Req To Est Supp-No New Case No
Docket Date
4/24/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2003
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
10/22/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2003
Description
OOP - Order Of Paternity
Docket Date
10/22/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2003
Description
ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf
Docket Date
10/22/2003
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
3/24/2004
Time
9:00
Event
Establishment Hearing
Date
3/24/2004
Time
9:00
Event
Establishment Hearing