« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FC2003-010189
Judge:
Astrowsky, Brad
File Date:
9/3/2003
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Family Court With Children
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Christen Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Gregory Lee Toland
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/2014
Description
IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access
Docket Date
6/6/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
5/22/2014
Description
OOA - Order Of Assignment / Restricted If Filed After 1/1/2006
Docket Date
5/27/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
MODIFY PARENTING TME AND CHILD SUPPORT
Filing Date
5/16/2014
Description
SMV - Stipulation To Mod Visitation
Docket Date
5/28/2014
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/16/2014
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
5/20/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/16/2007
Description
NPN - Nunc Pro Tunc Notification
Docket Date
3/1/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2006
Description
251 - ME: Hearing Simplified Modif
Docket Date
12/12/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2006
Description
JOR - Judgment And Order
Docket Date
12/18/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
Judgment and Order: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties
Filing Date
11/27/2006
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
11/28/2006
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
WITH SIGNATURE CONFIRMATION
Filing Date
11/24/2006
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
11/30/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2006
Description
EVS - Expedited Req To Enforce Visit
Docket Date
11/13/2006
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/8/2006
Description
COA - Order To Appear For Conference
Docket Date
11/8/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/2006
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
11/6/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/3/2006
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
11/21/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/3/2006
Description
OOA - Order Of Assignment / Restricted If Filed After 1/1/2006
Docket Date
11/29/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/3/2006
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
11/21/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/3/2006
Description
OCS - Order For Child Support
Docket Date
11/30/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2006
Description
COA - Order To Appear For Conference
Docket Date
9/28/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2006
Description
CME - Credit Memo
Docket Date
9/21/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
PETITIONER PAID 10.00
Filing Date
9/20/2006
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
9/21/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2006
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
9/21/2006
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
9/20/2006
Description
SMH - Req Hrg On Simplified Mod
Docket Date
9/21/2006
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
9/20/2006
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
9/21/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2006
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
9/21/2006
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
CREDIT MEMO
Filing Date
9/5/2006
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
9/6/2006
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
WITH SIGNATURE CONFIRMATION SERVED 09/01/2006
Filing Date
8/31/2006
Description
PRS - Praecipe Simp Mod Child Suppor
Docket Date
9/1/2006
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/29/2004
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
7/29/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/17/2004
Description
OOA - Order Of Assignment
Docket Date
7/7/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2004
Description
OCS - Order For Child Support
Docket Date
7/7/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2004
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated
Docket Date
6/16/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2004
Description
DDI - Decree Of Dissolution
Docket Date
6/28/2004
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
Decree of Dissolution
Filing Date
5/6/2004
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
6/25/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2004
Description
JCP - Joint Custody Plan
Docket Date
6/25/2004
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/19/2004
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
3/25/2004
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/8/2004
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
4/16/2004
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
FOR PETITION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS
Filing Date
2/25/2004
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
3/2/2004
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/25/2004
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
5/11/2004
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/25/2004
Description
PTO - Petition Temp Orders
Docket Date
5/11/2004
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
WITH CHILDREN FOR CHILD CUSTODY/VISITATION/FOR CHILD SUPPORT
Filing Date
1/15/2004
Description
231 - ME: Conciliation Terminated
Docket Date
2/23/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/24/2003
Description
OCS - Order For Child Support
Docket Date
4/24/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/20/2003
Description
233 - ME: Referral To Conciliation Services
Docket Date
12/15/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2003
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
11/14/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2003
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
2/9/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER OF PROTECTION
Filing Date
11/10/2003
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
11/14/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONDENT ATTENDED
Filing Date
11/6/2003
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
11/13/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 10/31/03
Filing Date
10/30/2003
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing
Docket Date
1/29/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2003
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/29/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
SETTING HEARING FOR 11/13/03
Filing Date
10/24/2003
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
10/31/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
PETITIONER ATTENDED
Filing Date
10/10/2003
Description
ASP - Affidavit Of Service Order Of Protection
Docket Date
10/16/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 10/9/03
Filing Date
9/24/2003
Description
OPR - Order Of Protection
Docket Date
9/26/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/24/2003
Description
POP - Petition/Order Of Protection
Docket Date
9/26/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/24/2003
Description
PPR - Praecipe For Order Protection
Docket Date
10/1/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/24/2003
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
10/2/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/24/2003
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
10/2/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/3/2003
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
9/4/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/3/2003
Description
CSI - Child Support Information Form
Docket Date
9/4/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/3/2003
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
9/4/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/3/2003
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
9/4/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/3/2003
Description
AFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children
Docket Date
9/4/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/3/2003
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
9/4/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/3/2003
Description
ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf
Docket Date
9/4/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/3/2003
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/4/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
REGARDING CREDITORS
Filing Date
9/3/2003
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
9/4/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/3/2003
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
9/4/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
11/13/2003
Time
10:45
Event
Order Of Protection Hearing
Date
4/27/2004
Time
8:30
Event
Child Support Calculation Appt
Date
5/6/2004
Time
8:30
Event
Default Hearing
Date
7/6/2004
Time
13:45
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
11/3/2006
Time
14:00
Event
Post Decree Child Support Conference
Date
11/3/2006
Time
15:00
Event
Post Decree Child Support Evidentiary Hearing
Date
12/7/2006
Time
12:30
Event
Enforcement Conference
Date
12/7/2006
Time
13:45
Event
Enforcement Evidentiary Hearing