« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FC2002-011625
Judge:
Russell, Andrew
File Date:
11/15/2002
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Family Court With Children
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
(1)Dept Of Economic Security (DES)
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Attorney
Julie Rose
Party Name
Stefanie Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Darren Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2003
Description
OLS - Order Dismiss Lack Of Service
Docket Date
6/20/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/23/2002
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
3/8/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2002
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
11/19/2002
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
1/30/2003
Time
9:00
Event
Establishment Hearing