Family Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | FC2002-006378 | Judge: | Gentry, Jo Lynn |
File Date: | 5/31/2002 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Family Court With Children |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Dept Of Economic Security (DES) | Petitioner | Julia Smock | |
Yvonne Rene Montano | Petitioner | Female | Pro Per |
Party is a minor: name not published | In The Matter Of (IMO) | Unknown | Pro Per |
Jaime Remigio Abeytia | Respondent | Male | Pro Per |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
10/16/2003 | ORA - Order To Appear | 4/24/2004 | |
9/11/2003 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 9/16/2003 | |
9/11/2003 | SES - Req To Est Supp-No New Case No | 11/10/2003 | |
9/11/2003 | ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf | 8/12/2009 | |
5/31/2002 | OOP - Order Of Paternity | 6/5/2002 | Petitioner |
5/31/2002 | COM - Complaint | 6/5/2002 | Petitioner |
Case Calendar | |||
---|---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event | |
12/3/2003 | 9:00 | Establishment Hearing |