Family Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | FC2002-004317 | Judge: | Schwartz, Aryeh |
File Date: | 4/12/2002 | Location: | Northeast |
Case Type: | Family Court With Children |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Cami Jostes | Petitioner | Female | Bruce Cohen |
Todd Jostes | Respondent | Male | James Viles |
Dept Of Economic Security (DES) | Petitioner | Deborah Rohrbacher |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
3/9/2016 | IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access | 3/9/2016 | |
NOTE: | |||
2/12/2016 | JOR - Judgment And Order | 2/19/2016 | |
NOTE: Judgment and Order: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties | |||
12/16/2003 | AOA - Administrative Order Of Assign | 4/24/2004 | |
3/18/2003 | ORD - Order | 7/12/2003 | |
NOTE: TERMINATING CHILD SUPPORT ORDER AND/OR STOP/MODIFY THE ORDER OF ASSIGNMENT | |||
1/8/2003 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 1/14/2003 | |
NOTE: SERVED 1/2/03 | |||
1/8/2003 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 1/14/2003 | |
NOTE: SERVED 1/2/03 | |||
12/27/2002 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 1/2/2003 | |
12/27/2002 | PSM - Pet To Stop/Modify Wage Assgnt | 3/15/2003 | |
12/12/2002 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal | 3/8/2003 | |
NOTE: WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |||
12/10/2002 | RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail | 2/28/2003 | |
11/27/2002 | STP - Stipulation | 1/31/2003 | |
NOTE: REGARDING DISMISSAL OF ACTION | |||
11/26/2002 | AOA - Administrative Order Of Assign | 1/18/2003 | |
11/7/2002 | OAC - Orderto Attend Dcm Conference | 6/11/2003 | |
NOTE: AT DCM COURT CONFERENCE | |||
8/20/2002 | ORD - Order | 9/12/2002 | |
NOTE: PENDENTE LITE | |||
7/25/2002 | ANS - Answer | 7/31/2002 | |
7/24/2002 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 7/24/2002 | |
7/18/2002 | PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support | 8/17/2002 | |
7/16/2002 | AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06 | 8/12/2002 | |
7/15/2002 | 904-Me: Ruling/Judgement/Decree | 7/15/2002 | |
6/18/2002 | 291 - ME: Mental Health Expert Appointment | 6/18/2002 | |
5/23/2002 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 6/14/2002 | |
NOTE: SERVED 5/16/02 | |||
5/15/2002 | OSC - Order To Show Cause | 5/28/2002 | |
NOTE: REGARDING PENDENTE LITE RELIEF | |||
5/7/2002 | AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06 | 5/17/2002 | |
5/7/2002 | PTT - Petition | 5/17/2002 | |
NOTE: FOR PENDENTE LITE RELIEF | |||
4/12/2002 | COM - Complaint | 4/16/2002 | |
4/12/2002 | SUM - Summons | 4/16/2002 | |
4/12/2002 | PIN - Preliminary Injunction | 4/16/2002 | |
4/12/2002 | NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins | 4/16/2002 | |
4/12/2002 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 4/16/2002 | |
4/12/2002 | CSI - Child Support Information Form | 4/16/2002 | |
4/12/2002 | ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf | 4/16/2002 |
Case Calendar | |||
---|---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event | |
6/12/2002 | 9:45 | Return | |
7/11/2002 | 15:15 | Temporary Order Evidentiary Hearing |