« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
DR2000-096243
Judge:
Valenzuela, Michael
File Date:
10/11/2000
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Domestic Relations
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Deborah Ann Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Jamie Clay Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/29/2001 1:30:00 PM
Description
CDS - Consent Decree
Docket Date
5/29/2001 1:30:00 PM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
5/29/2001
Description
SCD - Stip For Entry Consent Decree
Docket Date
5/31/2001
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
4/25/2001
Description
RAC - Request for Change Of Address/Name
Docket Date
4/26/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2000
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
10/12/2000
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
10/11/2000
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
10/12/2000
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
10/11/2000
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
10/12/2000
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
10/11/2000
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
10/12/2000
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
10/11/2000
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
10/12/2000
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
SERVED 10-11-00
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file