« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
DR2000-071075
Judge:
Francis, Jillian
File Date:
11/1/2000
Location:
Northwest
Case Type:
Domestic Relations
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Pauline M Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
William L Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Craig Collins
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/2002
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
8/5/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/2002
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
8/5/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/4/2002
Description
910 - Case Transferred To Northwest
Docket Date
7/4/2002
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
5/15/2001
Time
21:58
Event
Order Dismiss Lack Of Service