« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
DR2000-001574
Judge:
Williams, Paula
File Date:
1/31/2000
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Domestic Relations
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Robert Wayne Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Cindy Lea Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2000 9:19:00 AM
Description
DDI - Decree Of Dissolution
Docket Date
5/15/2000 9:19:00 AM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
2/28/2000
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
3/2/2000
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/28/2000
Description
AAD - Application And Affidavit Of Default
Docket Date
3/11/2000
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
1/31/2000
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
2/3/2000
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
1/31/2000
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/3/2000
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
1/31/2000
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
2/3/2000
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
1/31/2000
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
2/3/2000
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file