« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
DR1999-007642
Judge:
Knapp, James
File Date:
4/30/1999
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Domestic Relations
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Corene Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
(2)Dept Of Economic Security (DES)
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Attorney
John Drumm
Party Name
Tesfaye O Gulilat
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/1999
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated
Docket Date
9/17/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/24/1999
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
6/29/1999
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/21/1999
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
7/1/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/1999
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue
Docket Date
6/17/1999
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
6/16/1999
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
6/17/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
5/13/1999
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
5/14/1999
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
5/12/1999
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/13/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 05/09/99
Filing Date
5/12/1999
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/19/1999
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO APPEAR
Filing Date
4/30/1999
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
5/5/1999
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/30/1999
Description
TRM - Transmittal
Docket Date
5/5/1999
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file