« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
DR1999-003935
Judge:
Garbarino, David
File Date:
3/5/1999
Location:
Northwest
Case Type:
Domestic Relations
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Susie Encinas Abeyta
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Jaime Remigio Abeytia
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
(3)Dept Of Economic Security (DES)
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Attorney
Julia Smock
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2017
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
5/16/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/2015
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
6/15/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/2014
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
11/12/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/4/2013
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
2/5/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/17/2010
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
6/29/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2009
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
1/21/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/2007
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
3/13/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2007
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
2/22/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/18/2006
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
9/22/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2005
Description
AOA - Administrative Order Of Assign
Docket Date
11/7/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2003
Description
AOA - Administrative Order Of Assign
Docket Date
4/21/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/7/2003
Description
299 - ME: Child Support Arrest Warrant
Docket Date
1/15/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/25/2002
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/10/2002
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF PROVIDING ARREARS CALCULATION
Filing Date
11/15/2002
Description
268 - ME: Expedited Services Conference Scheduled
Docket Date
11/15/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/2002
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
9/24/2002
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 9/5/02
Filing Date
8/30/2002
Description
ASA - Affidavit in Support of Application for Deferral or Waiver of Service Process Costs
Docket Date
10/4/2002
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/30/2002
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
10/4/2002
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/30/2002
Description
ESE - Expedited Request To Enforce Support
Docket Date
10/4/2002
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/30/2002
Description
EOA - Expedited Order To Appear
Docket Date
10/4/2002
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/30/2002
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
10/4/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/14/2002
Description
AOA - Administrative Order Of Assign
Docket Date
5/28/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/29/2001
Description
AOA - Administrative Order Of Assign
Docket Date
12/31/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2001
Description
AOA - Administrative Order Of Assign
Docket Date
6/6/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/2001
Description
AOA - Administrative Order Of Assign
Docket Date
3/1/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2000
Description
AOA - Administrative Order Of Assign
Docket Date
12/28/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2000
Description
AOA - Administrative Order Of Assign
Docket Date
4/14/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/24/2000
Description
AOA - Administrative Order Of Assign
Docket Date
3/29/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2000
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
2/17/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/5/2000
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
1/7/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/1999
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont
Docket Date
11/16/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/1999
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
9/30/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/15/1999
Description
OOA - Order Of Assignment
Docket Date
9/30/1999
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/13/1999 10:38:00 AM
Description
DDI - Decree Of Dissolution
Docket Date
9/13/1999 10:38:00 AM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
9/13/1999
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
10/1/1999
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/10/1999
Description
OCO - Order Attend Conciliation Srvs
Docket Date
9/24/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/2/1999
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
9/14/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/1999
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
9/8/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/18/1999
Description
OOA - Order Of Assignment
Docket Date
9/8/1999
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
8/16/1999
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
8/20/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/1999
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
6/4/1999
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS RE CHILD CUSTODY/VISITATION/SUPPORT AND DIVISION OF DEBTS
Filing Date
6/1/1999
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
6/4/1999
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/1/1999
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
6/4/1999
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/1/1999
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
6/4/1999
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/17/1999
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
5/20/1999
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
SERVED 4/8/99
Filing Date
5/17/1999
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
5/21/1999
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/17/1999
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/15/1999
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/17/1999
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/17/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 3/9/99
Filing Date
3/5/1999
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
3/9/1999
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/5/1999
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
3/9/1999
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/5/1999
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
3/9/1999
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/5/1999
Description
AFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children
Docket Date
3/9/1999
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/5/1999
Description
APD - Application Waiver/Defferral
Docket Date
3/9/1999
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/5/1999
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
3/9/1999
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/5/1999
Description
ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf
Docket Date
3/9/1999
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
12/3/2002
Time
8:00
Event
Expedited Service Conference