« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
DR1998-092433
Judge:
Gnepper, Gregory
File Date:
5/4/1998
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Domestic Relations
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Evelyn Kay Bethea Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Carey Robert Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/1999
Description
OLP - Order Dismiss Lack Prosecution
Docket Date
3/4/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/1998
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
8/4/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/8/1998
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
8/5/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
OF PUBLICATION
Filing Date
5/4/1998
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
5/6/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/4/1998
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
5/6/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/4/1998
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
5/6/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/4/1998
Description
ODC - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
5/6/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/4/1998
Description
ASA - Affidavit in Support of Application for Deferral or Waiver of Service Process Costs
Docket Date
5/6/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/4/1998
Description
APD - Application Waiver/Defferral
Docket Date
5/6/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file