« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
DR1998-091774
Judge:
McDowell, David
File Date:
4/2/1998
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Domestic Relations
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Lorene Jean Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Richard Charles Matteson
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/31/1998 8:15:00 AM
Description
DDI - Decree Of Dissolution
Docket Date
7/31/1998 8:15:00 AM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
7/31/1998
Description
SCD - Stip For Entry Consent Decree
Docket Date
8/5/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/24/1998
Description
RAC - Request for Change Of Address/Name
Docket Date
7/30/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
7/15/1998
Description
OAC - Orderto Attend Dcm Conference
Docket Date
7/16/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/1998
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
4/28/1998
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
4/7/1998
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
4/17/1998
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
4/7/1998
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
4/17/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/2/1998
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
4/3/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/2/1998
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
4/3/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/2/1998
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
4/3/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file