« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
DR1998-022340
Judge:
Brooks, Robert
File Date:
12/11/1998
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Domestic Relations
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
William Dean Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Diane Gail Bigelow
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/5/1999
Description
MAD - Motion And Affidavit For Default Dissolution
Docket Date
3/17/1999
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/3/1999 7:55:00 AM
Description
CDS - Consent Decree
Docket Date
3/3/1999 7:55:00 AM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
1/4/1999
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
1/8/1999
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/11/1998
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
12/15/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/11/1998
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
12/15/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/11/1998
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
12/15/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/11/1998
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
12/18/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/11/1998
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
12/18/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file