« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
DR1998-017892
Judge:
Woo, Cassie
File Date:
9/28/1998
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Domestic Relations
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Michael W Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Elizabeth R Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Joseph Charles
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/12/2006
Description
NWA - Notice Of Withdrawal Of Attorney
Docket Date
1/23/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/12/2006
Description
ODS - Ord Dismiss Lack Service Post
Docket Date
1/26/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Filing Date
1/9/2006
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
1/9/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/2005
Description
ESE - Expedited Request To Enforce Support
Docket Date
8/31/2005
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
1/10/2002
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/6/2002
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
MODIFYING CUSTODY/PARENTING TIME/CHILD SUPPORT
Filing Date
12/28/2001
Description
RAC - Request for Change Of Address/Name
Docket Date
1/22/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/24/2001
Description
SMC - Stipulation To Modify Custody
Docket Date
1/16/2002
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/24/2001
Description
JCP - Joint Custody Plan
Docket Date
1/16/2002
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/24/2001
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
1/16/2002
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/17/2001
Description
LET - Letter
Docket Date
9/26/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/7/2001
Description
LET - Letter
Docket Date
8/17/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2001
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
1/29/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/26/2000
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
1/11/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/26/2000
Description
JCP - Joint Custody Plan
Docket Date
1/11/2001
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/26/2000
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/11/2001
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
MODIFYING CUSTODY, VISITATION, AND CHILD SUPPORT
Filing Date
12/26/2000
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/16/2001
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
STOPPING ORDER OF ASSIGNMENT
Filing Date
12/1/2000
Description
SMC - Stipulation To Modify Custody
Docket Date
12/21/2000
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/14/2000
Description
RAC - Request for Change Of Address/Name
Docket Date
4/20/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/1/1999
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
11/18/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/1999
Description
OOA - Order Of Assignment
Docket Date
11/18/1999
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
AFTER HEARING
Filing Date
10/20/1999
Description
241 - ME: Decree Signed By Court
Docket Date
10/25/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/1999 3:38:00 PM
Description
DDI - Decree Of Dissolution
Docket Date
10/19/1999 3:38:00 PM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
10/19/1999
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
11/3/1999
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
8/24/1999
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
9/3/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MEDIATION
Filing Date
8/18/1999
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
8/25/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/1999
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
8/26/1999
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/4/1999
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated
Docket Date
8/10/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/1999
Description
284 - ME: Order To Appear
Docket Date
7/23/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/14/1999
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/15/1999
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONCILIATION SERVICES TO CONDUCT A FAMILY ASSESSMENT
Filing Date
7/12/1999
Description
OCO - Order Attend Conciliation Srvs
Docket Date
7/14/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/24/1999
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
6/25/1999
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
CONTINUING REVIEW HEARING SET FOR 7/9/99
Filing Date
6/18/1999
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued
Docket Date
6/23/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/1999
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue
Docket Date
6/17/1999
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
RETURN HEARING SET FOR 07/09/99
Filing Date
6/8/1999
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
6/9/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/1999
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/8/1999
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
OF FILING CHILD SUPPORT WORKSHEET PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER
Filing Date
5/17/1999
Description
284 - ME: Order To Appear
Docket Date
5/17/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/1999
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
5/3/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/1999
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/4/1999
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF FINANCIAL INFORMATION
Filing Date
4/19/1999
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
5/4/1999
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO PETITION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE TEMPORARY ORDERS
Filing Date
4/15/1999
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
4/30/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/1999
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
4/1/1999
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
3/30/1999
Description
OSC - Order To Show Cause
Docket Date
4/14/1999
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
RE PENDENTE LITE ORDERS
Filing Date
3/1/1999
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
3/9/1999
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
2/26/1999
Description
PSC - Petition For Order To Show Cause
Docket Date
3/9/1999
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
IN RE PENDENTE LITE ORDERS
Filing Date
2/26/1999
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
3/9/1999
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
2/25/1999
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
3/4/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
FROM DCM CASE MANAGER TO JUDICIAL OFFICER
Filing Date
2/3/1999
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
2/9/1999
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/2/1999
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
2/10/1999
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
1/12/1999
Description
OAC - Orderto Attend Dcm Conference
Docket Date
1/15/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/31/1998
Description
OAC - Orderto Attend Dcm Conference
Docket Date
1/6/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/23/1998
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
12/29/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/1998
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
11/9/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
10/24/1998
Description
ASA - Affidavit in Support of Application for Deferral or Waiver of Service Process Costs
Docket Date
10/24/1998
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
10/24/1998
Description
APD - Application Waiver/Defferral
Docket Date
10/24/1998
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
10/20/1998
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/22/1998
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 092998
Filing Date
10/20/1998
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
10/30/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
10/16/1998
Description
OWL - Ord Wav Fees/Costs Ltd Circums
Docket Date
11/2/1998
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
10/16/1998
Description
PPR - Praecipe For Order Protection
Docket Date
10/19/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/1998
Description
OPR - Order Of Protection
Docket Date
10/22/1998
Filing Party
NOTE:
DENIED
Filing Date
10/16/1998
Description
POP - Petition/Order Of Protection
Docket Date
10/22/1998
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
10/16/1998
Description
APD - Application Waiver/Defferral
Docket Date
10/30/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/1998
Description
ASA - Affidavit in Support of Application for Deferral or Waiver of Service Process Costs
Docket Date
10/30/1998
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
10/13/1998
Description
PTO - Petition Temp Orders
Docket Date
10/26/1998
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
RE SPOUSAL SUPPORT/PROPERTY/DEBTS/CHILD CUSTODY/VISITATION/CHILD SUPPORT
Filing Date
10/13/1998
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
10/28/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/1998
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
10/24/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
GRANTED
Filing Date
10/13/1998
Description
APD - Application Waiver/Defferral
Docket Date
10/24/1998
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
10/13/1998
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
10/24/1998
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
10/13/1998
Description
SCP - Sole Custody Plan
Docket Date
10/24/1998
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
10/13/1998
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
10/24/1998
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
10/5/1998
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
10/19/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/5/1998
Description
SCP - Sole Custody Plan
Docket Date
10/19/1998
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
10/5/1998
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
10/19/1998
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
10/5/1998
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence
Docket Date
10/19/1998
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
10/5/1998
Description
APD - Application Waiver/Defferral
Docket Date
10/19/1998
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
10/5/1998
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
10/7/1998
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
10/5/1998
Description
MSE - Motion To Set & Cert/Readiness
Docket Date
10/14/1998
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
9/28/1998
Description
AFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children
Docket Date
9/30/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/28/1998
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
9/30/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/28/1998
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
9/30/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/28/1998
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
9/30/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file