« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
DR1998-004645
Judge:
Parker, Amanda
File Date:
3/16/1998
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Domestic Relations
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Dwayne Allen Erickson
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Bert Roos
Party Name
Marjorie A Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/26/1998
Description
211 - ME: Dissolution Hearing
Docket Date
10/28/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/20/1998 1:30:00 PM
Description
DDI - Decree Of Dissolution
Docket Date
10/20/1998 1:30:00 PM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
10/13/1998
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/24/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY
Filing Date
10/9/1998
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
10/16/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/1998
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/22/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO WAIVE APPEARANCE PARENT INFORMATION PROGRAM CLASS
Filing Date
9/23/1998
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/2/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO WAIVE APPEARANCE AT PARENT INFORMATION PROGRAM CLASS
Filing Date
9/23/1998
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/2/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY
Filing Date
6/26/1998
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
7/8/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
OF MAILING
Filing Date
5/27/1998
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
6/3/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/27/1998
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
4/30/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/27/1998
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
4/30/1998
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 041898
Filing Date
3/16/1998
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
3/18/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/16/1998
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
3/18/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/16/1998
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
3/18/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file