« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
DR1997-023869
Judge:
Astrowsky, Brad
File Date:
12/30/1997
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Domestic Relations
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Carol Jean Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pauline Fleminger
Party Name
Grady Eugene Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/1999
Description
NWA - Notice Withdrawal Of Attorney
Docket Date
2/2/1999
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/14/1998
Description
SCD - Stip For Entry Consent Decree
Docket Date
12/21/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/11/1998 10:05:00 AM
Description
CDS - Consent Decree
Docket Date
12/11/1998 10:05:00 AM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
12/11/1998
Description
JCP - Joint Custody Plan
Docket Date
12/21/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
10/21/1998
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
10/24/1998
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
CREDIT MEMO $121
Filing Date
10/19/1998
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
10/29/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/30/1998
Description
084 - ME: Case Continued Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
10/2/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/22/1998
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/1/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO SUBMIT CONSENT DECREE OF DISSOLUTION WITHOUT P2'S CERTIFICATE OF PARENT; PROGRAM
Filing Date
8/25/1998
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
9/5/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO SUBMIT CONSENT DECREE WITHOUT RESPONDENTS CERTIFICATION OF COMPLETION PARENT; PROGRAM
Filing Date
8/25/1998
Description
MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
9/5/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
7/29/1998
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
8/4/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/1998
Description
LET - Letter
Docket Date
5/14/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/9/1998
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
4/10/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/1998
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
3/31/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/24/1998
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/27/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
REGARDING PENDENTE LITE STIPULATED AGREEMENT
Filing Date
3/24/1998
Description
OOA - Order Of Assignment
Docket Date
3/31/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/16/1998
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/18/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
DUPLICATE SERVED 02/23/98
Filing Date
3/3/1998
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
3/5/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/3/1998
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
3/5/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
PENDENTE LITE STIPULATED AGREEMENT
Filing Date
3/2/1998
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued
Docket Date
3/3/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/1998
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/2/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
SERVED 2-23-98
Filing Date
2/12/1998
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
2/13/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
REQUESTING PERMISSION TO MOVE FROM ARIZONA TO IOWA WITH THE MINOR CHILDREN
Filing Date
2/12/1998
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
2/13/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
FOR EXPEDITED HEARING ON MOTION REQUESTING PERMISSION TO MOVE FROM ARIZONA TO; IOWA WITH MINOR CHILDREN
Filing Date
12/30/1997
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
1/2/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/30/1997
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
1/2/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/30/1997
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
1/2/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file