« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
DR1997-022854
Judge:
DRJUN, DRJUN
File Date:
12/9/1997
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Domestic Relations
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Loretta Louise Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Lance Martin
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/1998
Description
OLS - Order Dismiss Lack Of Service
Docket Date
4/23/1998
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Filing Date
2/26/1998
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
2/26/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/9/1997
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
12/11/1997
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/9/1997
Description
OWC - Order Waiving Court Costs
Docket Date
12/11/1997
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/9/1997
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
12/11/1997
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/9/1997
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
12/11/1997
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/9/1997
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
12/23/1997
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file