Family Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | DR1997-010322 | Judge: | Williams, Paula |
File Date: | 5/20/1997 | Location: | Northeast |
Case Type: | Domestic Relations |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Cami Jostes | Petitioner | Female | Douglas Drury |
Todd Jostes | Respondent | Male | Robert Beucler |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
1/27/1999 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal | 2/8/1999 | Petitioner |
NOTE: WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |||
1/22/1999 | OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar | 1/28/1999 | Petitioner |
1/14/1999 | STP - Stipulation | 1/20/1999 | Petitioner |
NOTE: FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |||
12/18/1998 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 12/29/1998 | Respondent |
12/14/1998 | LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence | 12/22/1998 | Petitioner |
11/5/1998 | MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar | 11/16/1998 | Petitioner |
7/13/1998 | OOA - Order Of Assignment | 7/17/1998 | Petitioner |
7/13/1998 | ORD - Order | 7/17/1998 | Petitioner |
NOTE: TEMPORARY | |||
7/13/1998 | OCS - Order For Child Support | 7/17/1998 | Petitioner |
6/9/1998 | 906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set | 6/12/1998 | |
6/4/1998 | PEC - Parent Education Certificate | 6/12/1998 | |
5/19/1998 | NOT - Notice | 5/29/1998 | Petitioner |
NOTE: OF LODGING | |||
5/19/1998 | PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support | 5/29/1998 | Petitioner |
5/15/1998 | NOT - Notice | 5/27/1998 | Petitioner |
NOTE: OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |||
4/27/1998 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 4/30/1998 | |
4/15/1998 | ANS - Answer | 5/4/1998 | Respondent |
4/10/1998 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 4/13/1998 | Petitioner |
NOTE: SERVED 4-6-98 | |||
4/10/1998 | OSC - Order To Show Cause | 4/14/1998 | Petitioner |
NOTE: RE: PENDENTE LITE | |||
3/20/1998 | AFF - Affidavit | 3/20/1998 | Petitioner |
NOTE: OF FINANCIAL INFORMATION | |||
3/20/1998 | PSC - Petition For Order To Show Cause | 3/20/1998 | Petitioner |
NOTE: RE: PENDENTE LITE ORDERS | |||
1/30/1998 | OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar | 2/9/1998 | Petitioner |
1/16/1998 | MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar | 1/16/1998 | Petitioner |
6/2/1997 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 6/5/1997 | Respondent |
NOTE: SERVED 5-29-97 | |||
6/2/1997 | SUM - Summons | 6/5/1997 | Petitioner |
5/20/1997 | PIN - Preliminary Injunction | 5/22/1997 | Petitioner |
5/20/1997 | COM - Complaint | 5/22/1997 | Petitioner |
5/20/1997 | NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins | 5/22/1997 | Petitioner |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
There are no calendar events on file |