« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
DR1997-003201
Judge:
Kalman, Amy
File Date:
2/13/1997
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Domestic Relations
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Anthony Quint Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Theresa S Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/1998
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
4/30/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/8/1998
Description
047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal
Docket Date
4/10/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/1998
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
2/27/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/1997
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
12/18/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/1997
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
10/8/1997
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF DEFAULT
Filing Date
9/30/1997
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/8/1997
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 9-15-97
Filing Date
9/30/1997
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
10/8/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/1997
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
2/19/1997
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/13/1997
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
2/19/1997
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/13/1997
Description
OWC - Order Waiving Court Costs
Docket Date
2/19/1997
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/13/1997
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
2/19/1997
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/13/1997
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
2/19/1997
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/13/1997
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
2/19/1997
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
PERTAINING TO MINOR CHILDREN OF THE PARTIES TO A DISSOLUTION MEETING
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file