Family Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | DR1996-090699 | Judge: | Miller, Keith |
File Date: | 2/6/1996 | Location: | Southeast |
Case Type: | Domestic Relations |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Angela K Viramontes | Petitioner | Female | Pro Per |
Dept Of Economic Security (DES) | Petitioner | Leanne Martin | |
Party is a minor: name not published | In The Matter Of (IMO) | Male | Pro Per |
Todd Jostes | Respondent | Male | Pro Per |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
2/5/1997 | 047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal | 2/10/1997 | |
8/8/1996 | 208 - ME: Case On Inactive Calendar | 8/29/1996 | |
2/6/1996 | COM - Complaint | 2/7/1996 | Petitioner |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
There are no calendar events on file |