« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
DR1996-021480
Judge:
Parker, Amanda
File Date:
12/5/1996
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Domestic Relations
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Anita Louise Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
John Wylie Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/1998
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
10/2/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/22/1998
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
11/5/1998
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
AMENDED STIPULATED QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS/FOR THE DIAL CORPORATION; RETIREMENT INCOME PLAN, THE DIAL CORPORATION CAPITAL ACCUMULATION PLAN AND THE; DIAL CORPORATION SUPPLEMENTAL PENSION PLAN
Filing Date
9/19/1997
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/4/1997
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
STIPULATED QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS
Filing Date
7/29/1997
Description
NWA - Notice Withdrawal Of Attorney
Docket Date
7/31/1997
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
7/14/1997 2:40:00 PM
Description
CDS - Consent Decree
Docket Date
7/14/1997 2:40:00 PM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
7/14/1997
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
7/21/1997
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO FILE A CONSENT DECREE
Filing Date
7/11/1997
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
7/21/1997
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
PROPERTY SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT
Filing Date
6/3/1997
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
6/4/1997
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
FOR P2 STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF CONSENT DECREE OF DIVORCE
Filing Date
2/19/1997
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
2/20/1997
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/19/1997
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
3/7/1997
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/5/1996
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
12/9/1996
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/5/1996
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
12/9/1996
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/5/1996
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
12/9/1996
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file