« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
DR1996-019604
Judge:
Halvorson, Ashley
File Date:
11/1/1996
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Domestic Relations
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
William Dean Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Jan Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/1997
Description
211 - ME: Dissolution Hearing
Docket Date
3/14/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/5/1997 9:10:00 AM
Description
DDI - Decree Of Dissolution
Docket Date
3/5/1997 9:10:00 AM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
12/5/1996
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
12/31/1996
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/1/1996
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
11/4/1996
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/1/1996
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
11/4/1996
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/1/1996
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
11/4/1996
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/1/1996
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
11/4/1996
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/1/1996
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
11/4/1996
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file