« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
DR1996-007045
Judge:
Astrowsky, Brad
File Date:
4/22/1996
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Domestic Relations
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Susan R Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Michael Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/8/1996 8:46:00 AM
Description
DDI - Decree Of Dissolution
Docket Date
7/8/1996 8:46:00 AM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
7/8/1996
Description
211 - ME: Dissolution Hearing
Docket Date
7/10/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/1996
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
5/29/1996
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/20/1996
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
5/29/1996
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
P2 5-23-96
Filing Date
5/20/1996
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
5/29/1996
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/22/1996
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
4/24/1996
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/22/1996
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
4/24/1996
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/22/1996
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
4/24/1996
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file