« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
DR1996-006345
Judge:
Woo, Cassie
File Date:
4/10/1996
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Domestic Relations
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Willie L Jones
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Michael Gertell
Party Name
Party is a minor: name not published
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/1996
Description
241 - ME: Decree Signed By Court
Docket Date
6/20/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/18/1996 9:05:00 AM
Description
DDI - Decree Of Dissolution
Docket Date
6/18/1996 9:05:00 AM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
6/11/1996
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
6/13/1996
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO PROCEED WITH CONSENT DECREE FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE
Filing Date
4/15/1996
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
4/22/1996
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/10/1996
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
4/12/1996
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/10/1996
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
4/12/1996
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/10/1996
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
4/12/1996
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file