Family Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | DR1995-090711 | Judge: | Coury, Christopher |
File Date: | 2/6/1995 | Location: | Southeast |
Case Type: | Domestic Relations |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Angela K Viramontes | Petitioner | Female | Pro Per |
Dept Of Economic Security (DES) | Petitioner | Pro Per | |
Todd Jostes | Respondent | Male | Pro Per |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
3/20/1997 | 047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal | 3/25/1997 | |
7/10/1995 | ORD - Order | 7/12/1995 | Petitioner |
NOTE: CONTINUING CASE ON INACTIVE CALENDAR | |||
6/16/1995 | MOT - Motion | 6/19/1995 | Petitioner |
NOTE: TO CONTINUE CASE ON INACTIVE CALENDAR | |||
5/22/1995 | ADE - Application For Default | 5/23/1995 | Petitioner |
3/22/1995 | AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default | 3/24/1995 | Petitioner |
2/10/1995 | SUM - Summons | 2/24/1995 | Petitioner |
2/10/1995 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 2/24/1995 | Petitioner |
NOTE: UPON P3 BY RON JOSTES 2-7-95 | |||
2/6/1995 | COM - Complaint | 2/6/1995 | Petitioner |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
There are no calendar events on file |