« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
DR1995-021928
Judge:
Mata, Julie
File Date:
12/7/1995
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Domestic Relations
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Richard Lee Thomas
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
James Bruce
Party Name
Phyllis Marie Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/1996 11:07:00 AM
Description
DDI - Decree Of Dissolution
Docket Date
3/18/1996 11:07:00 AM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
3/18/1996
Description
211 - ME: Dissolution Hearing
Docket Date
3/19/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/1996
Description
AED - Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
2/28/1996
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/20/1996
Description
AED - Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
2/28/1996
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
1/16/1996
Description
APU - Affidavit Of Publication
Docket Date
1/19/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
1-13-96
Filing Date
1/16/1996
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
1/19/1996
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
BY PUB PURSUANT TO RULE IV
Filing Date
1/16/1996
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
1/19/1996
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/7/1995
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
12/8/1995
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/7/1995
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
12/8/1995
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/7/1995
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
12/8/1995
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file