« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
DR1995-010214
Judge:
Garbarino, David
File Date:
6/8/1995
Location:
Northwest
Case Type:
Domestic Relations
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Judith B Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Mathis Becker
Party Name
William Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/1995
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
11/28/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/20/1995
Description
241 - ME: Decree Signed By Court
Docket Date
10/25/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/1995 9:02:00 AM
Description
DDI - Decree Of Dissolution
Docket Date
10/17/1995 9:02:00 AM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
8/22/1995
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
9/1/1995
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO PROCEED BY WAY OF CONSENT DECREE
Filing Date
7/11/1995
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/14/1995
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
OF AND ACKNOW OF REC OF DOCS
Filing Date
6/8/1995
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
6/9/1995
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/8/1995
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
6/9/1995
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/8/1995
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
6/9/1995
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file