« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
DR1994-094711
Judge:
Cushner, Quintin
File Date:
7/28/1994
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Domestic Relations
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Angela K Viramontes
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
(2)Dept Of Economic Security (DES)
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Todd Jostes
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/9/1996
Description
301 - 301
Docket Date
4/9/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/1995
Description
208 - ME: Case On Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
2/16/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/1994
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
7/29/1994
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
PATERNITY CO/CHG
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file