« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
DR1994-021959
Judge:
McCarthy, Steven
File Date:
12/21/1994
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Domestic Relations
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Patricia L Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
(2)Dept Of Economic Security (DES)
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Attorney
Paige Martin
Party Name
Party is a minor: name not published
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Nathan J Andersen
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/2021
Description
SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment
Docket Date
8/30/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Satisfaction of Support Judgment and Release of Lien
Filing Date
12/20/2018
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
12/21/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/18/2018
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
12/19/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/18/2018
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
12/19/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2017
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
8/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/31/2017
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
6/1/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/2017
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
3/6/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/15/2016
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
9/20/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2016
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
6/22/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2016
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
4/6/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/2016
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
2/29/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/2015
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
7/13/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2015
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
4/16/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/17/2014
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
12/19/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2014
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
10/21/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2013
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
2/9/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/2012
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
6/29/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/2012
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
1/30/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2011
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
5/6/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2008
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
1/30/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2007
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
11/19/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2007
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
9/24/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2007
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
4/19/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/2006
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
12/15/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/30/2006
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
12/1/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2006
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
10/25/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2005
Description
AOA - Administrative Order Of Assign
Docket Date
11/2/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2005
Description
AOA - Administrative Order Of Assign
Docket Date
7/25/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/8/2005
Description
AOA - Administrative Order Of Assign
Docket Date
4/12/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/4/2003
Description
AOA - Administrative Order Of Assign
Docket Date
4/24/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2002
Description
AOA - Administrative Order Of Assign
Docket Date
10/31/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2001
Description
AOA - Administrative Order Of Assign
Docket Date
5/30/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2001
Description
AOA - Administrative Order Of Assign
Docket Date
1/25/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/3/1995
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
7/10/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE P4
Filing Date
6/27/1995
Description
053 - ME: Case Consolidation
Docket Date
6/28/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/1995
Description
TRM - Transmittal
Docket Date
7/7/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
CC DOCKET PRINTOUT
Filing Date
6/23/1995 10:33:00 AM
Description
JOR - Judgment And Order
Docket Date
6/23/1995 10:33:00 AM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
6/23/1995
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
7/5/1995
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
BY MAIL
Filing Date
6/23/1995
Description
ARP - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Service
Docket Date
7/5/1995
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
RE STIP
Filing Date
6/23/1995
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
7/5/1995
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/23/1995
Description
OOA - Order Of Assignment
Docket Date
7/7/1995
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
AUTOMATIC
Filing Date
6/16/1995
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
6/24/1995
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO ESTABLISH CHILD SUPP/REIMBUR/ARREARAGES & OTHER JUDG
Filing Date
6/15/1995
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
6/22/1995
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
STATE
Filing Date
12/21/1994
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
12/21/1994
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/21/1994
Description
OOP - Order Of Paternity
Docket Date
12/21/1994
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file