« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
DR1994-009294
Judge:
Woo, Cassie
File Date:
6/9/1994
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Domestic Relations
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Grace Ann Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
ROBERT FRIEDMAN
Party Name
Russell Walker Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
James Osborn Popp
Party Name
(3)Dept Of Economic Security (DES)
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Attorney
Connie Scoggins
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/29/2014
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
12/29/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT
Filing Date
2/26/2014
Description
QDO - Qualified Dom Rel Order
Docket Date
3/5/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/19/2014
Description
NOL - Notice of Lodging
Docket Date
2/21/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED QDRO AND REQUEST FOR ENTRY
Filing Date
2/11/2014
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
2/12/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2014
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
2/3/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2014
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
1/17/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2014
Description
NLR – Notice Of Limited Scope Representation
Docket Date
1/21/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2014
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/17/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ENTRY OF QDRO; ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF LODGING QDRO
Filing Date
12/3/2013
Description
NOL - Notice of Lodging
Docket Date
12/4/2013
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER
Filing Date
6/2/2009
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
6/3/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/20/2008
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
11/20/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2008
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
10/29/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2007
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
2/27/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/2006
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
10/16/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/2006
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
10/16/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/30/2006
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
6/8/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2006
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
4/20/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2005
Description
AOA - Administrative Order Of Assign
Docket Date
4/28/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/2/1999
Description
AOA - Administrative Order Of Assign
Docket Date
8/17/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/1998
Description
REC - Receipt
Docket Date
7/20/1998
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR CERT MAIL
Filing Date
7/6/1998
Description
EXH - Exhibit
Docket Date
7/15/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/1998
Description
LED - 2.8 (d) Letter
Docket Date
6/16/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/10/1997
Description
NWA - Notice Withdrawal Of Attorney
Docket Date
3/7/1997
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
1/28/1997
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
1/31/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/27/1996
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry
Docket Date
1/2/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/3/1996
Description
241 - ME: Decree Signed By Court
Docket Date
7/8/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/2/1996 10:33:00 AM
Description
DDI - Decree Of Dissolution
Docket Date
7/2/1996 10:33:00 AM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
7/2/1996
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
7/10/1996
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
IN RE ATTY FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
6/7/1996
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
6/17/1996
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO SERVE ASSIGNMENT ON NEW EMPLOYER
Filing Date
5/23/1996
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
5/24/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/1996
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/9/1996
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO EXTEND TIME TO FILD ATTY'S FEES AFFIDAVIT
Filing Date
4/22/1996
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
4/24/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/1996
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
4/26/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONCILIATION SVCS
Filing Date
4/17/1996
Description
WSH - Worksheet
Docket Date
4/30/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXHIBIT
Filing Date
3/29/1996
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/29/1996
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
OF NON-APPEARANCE
Filing Date
3/13/1996
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
3/14/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/1996
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset
Docket Date
3/14/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/11/1996
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
3/11/1996
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/11/1996
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
3/14/1996
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
3/5/1996
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
3/11/1996
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
JOINT PRETRIAL
Filing Date
3/5/1996
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
3/11/1996
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
3/5/1996
Description
LET - Letter
Docket Date
3/11/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/4/1996
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/7/1996
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
FOR CONTINUANCE OF THIS MATTER
Filing Date
12/27/1995
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting
Docket Date
12/28/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/1995
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
12/13/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/5/1995
Description
249 - ME:INTERIM Ord For Supervision
Docket Date
12/6/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/16/1995
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
11/20/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE P2
Filing Date
10/31/1995
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
11/2/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/1995
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/23/1995
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO MOT TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
10/11/1995
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
10/13/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF FIN INFO
Filing Date
10/11/1995
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/17/1995
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
FOR CONTINUANCE
Filing Date
10/11/1995
Description
LET - Letter
Docket Date
10/17/1995
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
9/26/1995
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
9/28/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
DATED 9/13/95 FROM CONCILIATION SERVICES
Filing Date
9/6/1995
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting
Docket Date
9/7/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/1995
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/14/1995
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
FOR WITHDRAWAL AS ATTY
Filing Date
8/24/1995
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
9/13/1995
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
FOR WITHDRAWAL AS ATTY OF RECORD
Filing Date
7/25/1995
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/27/1995
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
DRUG TESTING
Filing Date
7/24/1995
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set
Docket Date
7/25/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/18/1995
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
7/24/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
LAB TEST RESULTS
Filing Date
7/18/1995
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
7/24/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
LAB TEST RESULTS
Filing Date
7/13/1995
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/17/1995
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/30/1995
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
7/7/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRUG TEST ON P1
Filing Date
6/29/1995
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
6/30/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/1995
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
6/29/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRUG TESTS
Filing Date
6/21/1995
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
6/26/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/1995
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/24/1995
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO STOP RANDOM DRUG TESTG
Filing Date
6/13/1995
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
6/24/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
LAB TEST RESULT
Filing Date
6/12/1995
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/20/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRUG TESTING
Filing Date
6/1/1995
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
6/16/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONCILIATION SERV
Filing Date
5/31/1995
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
6/16/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
LAB TEST RESULTS
Filing Date
5/26/1995
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
6/12/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRUG TESTING
Filing Date
5/24/1995
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/6/1995
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
FOR W/DRAW AS ATT
Filing Date
5/23/1995
Description
MSE - Motion To Set & Cert/Readiness
Docket Date
5/31/1995
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
5/22/1995
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
6/5/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRUG TESTS
Filing Date
5/22/1995
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
6/5/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRUG TESTS
Filing Date
5/22/1995
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
6/5/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRUG TESTS
Filing Date
5/19/1995
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
6/1/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL
Filing Date
5/19/1995
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
6/1/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDICAL
Filing Date
5/18/1995
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
6/7/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/1995
Description
OOA - Order Of Assignment
Docket Date
5/25/1995
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
AUTOMATIC
Filing Date
5/11/1995
Description
WSH - Worksheet
Docket Date
5/19/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
PENDENTE LITE DIV OF INCOME
Filing Date
5/10/1995
Description
249 - ME:INTERIM Ord For Supervision
Docket Date
5/11/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/1995
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
5/19/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMT/FATHER
Filing Date
5/8/1995
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
5/17/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
CRT ORDERED SUBSTANCE ABUSE TESTING RE P2
Filing Date
5/8/1995
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
5/17/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
CRT ORDERED SUBSTANCE ABUSE TESTING REPORT RE P1
Filing Date
5/8/1995
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
5/10/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/28/1995
Description
LWE - List Of Witnesses/Exhibits
Docket Date
5/3/1995
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
4/14/1995
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
4/20/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/8/1994
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
12/9/1994
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
7/7/1994
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/11/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/9/1994
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
6/9/1994
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/9/1994
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
6/9/1994
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/9/1994
Description
ADC - App/Deferral/Costs/Fees/Ser
Docket Date
6/9/1994
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/9/1994
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
6/9/1994
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
FOR WAIVER OF FEES AND COST
Filing Date
6/9/1994
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
6/9/1994
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
AGAINST BOTH PET AND RES
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file