« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
DR1993-093527
Judge:
Cushner, Quintin
File Date:
9/24/1993
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Domestic Relations
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Irene Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Kay Wilkins
Party Name
Leroy Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Charles Franklin
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/1997
Description
RAC - Request for Change Of Address/Name
Docket Date
11/26/1997
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
1/29/1996
Description
RAC - Request for Change Of Address/Name
Docket Date
2/1/1996
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/4/1994 10:30:00 AM
Description
DDI - Decree Of Dissolution
Docket Date
4/4/1994 10:30:00 AM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
4/4/1994
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
4/11/1994
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO HEAR AS A DEFAULT
Filing Date
4/4/1994
Description
241 - ME: Decree Signed By Court
Docket Date
4/15/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/1994
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
3/15/1994
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
(ALIAS)
Filing Date
3/9/1994
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
3/14/1994
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/3/1993
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
12/13/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/3/1993
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/15/1993
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
PENDENTE LITE
Filing Date
11/15/1993
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
11/17/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
2ND AMENDED
Filing Date
11/10/1993
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
11/22/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
PENDENT LITE
Filing Date
11/8/1993
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated
Docket Date
11/16/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/1993
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
11/8/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO 2ND AMNEDED PET FOR DISSOLUTION
Filing Date
10/28/1993
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
11/1/1993
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
TO PETITION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: TEMPORARY ORDERS
Filing Date
10/28/1993
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
11/1/1993
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
OF FINANCIAL INFORMATION
Filing Date
10/27/1993
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
11/1/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
E
Filing Date
10/18/1993
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/25/1993
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
Filing Date
10/13/1993
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
10/15/1993
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
10/4/1993
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/6/1993
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO AMEND PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE RE: DISTRIBUTION OF ASSETS NOT; HERETOFORE ADDRESSED
Filing Date
10/4/1993
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
10/14/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/24/1993
Description
PSC - Petition For Order To Show Cause
Docket Date
9/27/1993
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TEMP ORDERS
Filing Date
9/24/1993
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
9/27/1993
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO ACCELERATE ORD TO SHOW CAUSE RE TEMP ORDERS
Filing Date
9/24/1993
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
9/27/1993
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/24/1993
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/27/1993
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
FOR WAIVER OF FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
9/24/1993
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
9/27/1993
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/24/1993
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
9/27/1993
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/24/1993
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
9/27/1993
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/24/1993
Description
AMC - Amended Complaint
Docket Date
9/27/1993
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/24/1993
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
9/27/1993
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
OF FINANCIAL INFORMATION
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file