« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
DR1993-017150
Judge:
DRJUN, DRJUN
File Date:
11/24/1993
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Domestic Relations
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Wayne Edward Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Lynn Anderson
Party Name
Dorothy Carol Taylor
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/1994 3:15:00 PM
Description
DDI - Decree Of Dissolution
Docket Date
3/28/1994 3:15:00 PM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
3/28/1994
Description
211 - ME: Dissolution Hearing
Docket Date
4/11/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/6/1994
Description
AED - Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
1/13/1994
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
1/6/1994
Description
999 - ME: Other
Docket Date
1/13/1994
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
DEFAULT
Filing Date
12/10/1993
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
12/15/1993
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/10/1993
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
12/15/1993
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
& WAIVER
Filing Date
11/24/1993
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
11/26/1993
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/24/1993
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
11/29/1993
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
AGAINST BOTH PET AND RES
Filing Date
11/24/1993
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
11/29/1993
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file