« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
DR1993-001938
Judge:
DRJUN, DRJUN
File Date:
2/12/1993
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Domestic Relations
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Jeane E Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Charles Friedman
Party Name
John N Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/24/1993
Description
208 - ME: Case On Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
12/1/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/1993 8:50:00 AM
Description
DDI - Decree Of Dissolution
Docket Date
11/17/1993 8:50:00 AM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
11/17/1993
Description
211 - ME: Dissolution Hearing
Docket Date
11/23/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/1993
Description
ADE - Application For Default
Docket Date
8/30/1993
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/27/1993
Description
ADE - Application For Default
Docket Date
8/30/1993
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/25/1993
Description
SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/4/1993
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/12/1993
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
2/12/1993
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/12/1993
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
2/12/1993
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/12/1993
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
2/12/1993
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file