« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
DR1993-001150
Judge:
DRJUN, DRJUN
File Date:
1/27/1993
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Domestic Relations
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Shirley Yvonne Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Charles Friedman
Party Name
Dale E Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/21/1993 4:00:00 PM
Description
DDI - Decree Of Dissolution
Docket Date
6/21/1993 4:00:00 PM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
6/21/1993
Description
211 - ME: Dissolution Hearing
Docket Date
6/24/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/1993
Description
ADE - Application For Default
Docket Date
4/28/1993
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
ENTRY
Filing Date
4/22/1993
Description
AED - Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
4/28/1993
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/31/1993
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
4/2/1993
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/31/1993
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
4/2/1993
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/29/1993
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
4/5/1993
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
1/27/1993
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
1/27/1993
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
1/27/1993
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
1/27/1993
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
1/27/1993
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
1/27/1993
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file