« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
DR1992-093806
Judge:
Cushner, Quintin
File Date:
11/23/1992
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Domestic Relations
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Steveh Edward Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Timothy Steadman
Party Name
Gina Marie Pearson Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2006
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
10/6/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2006
Description
OSO - Order Stopping Order of Assignment
Docket Date
10/4/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2006
Description
APM - Affidavit of Direct Payment
Docket Date
9/22/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF GINA MARIE PEARSON MEREDITH OF CHILD SUPPORT
Filing Date
9/20/2006
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/22/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED / RE MODIFICATION OF CHILD CUSTODY PARENTING TIME AND SUPPORT
Filing Date
9/20/2006
Description
OCS - Order For Child Support
Docket Date
10/4/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/7/1997
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
4/18/1997
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHILD AND SPOUSAL SUPPORT BILLING
Filing Date
3/27/1997
Description
OOA - Order Of Assignment
Docket Date
4/4/1997
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
AUTO
Filing Date
3/27/1997
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
4/14/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/1997
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/1/1997
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
STOPPING ORD OF ASSIGNMENT
Filing Date
3/27/1997
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/1/1997
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TERMINATING SPOUSAL MAINT
Filing Date
3/27/1997
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
4/1/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/1997
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
3/31/1997
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/3/1993 3:00:00 PM
Description
DDI - Decree Of Dissolution
Docket Date
2/3/1993 3:00:00 PM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
2/3/1993
Description
211 - ME: Dissolution Hearing
Docket Date
2/9/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/1993
Description
OOA - Order Of Assignment
Docket Date
2/16/1993
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
AUTO
Filing Date
2/3/1993
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
2/9/1993
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/3/1993
Description
CSO - Cso
Docket Date
2/9/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/1992
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
1/6/1993
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/23/1992
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
11/25/1992
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
11/23/1992
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
11/25/1992
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/23/1992
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
11/25/1992
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/23/1992
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
11/25/1992
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/23/1992
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
11/25/1992
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/23/1992
Description
AMC - Amended Complaint
Docket Date
11/25/1992
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/23/1992
Description
999 - ME: Other
Docket Date
11/25/1992
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file