« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
DR1992-009003
Judge:
Parker, Amanda
File Date:
7/9/1992
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Domestic Relations
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Kathy J Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Dennis J Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2001
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
5/17/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2001
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/17/2001
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
STOPPING ORD OF WAGE ASSIGNMENT
Filing Date
5/4/2001
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
5/14/2001
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
AGREEMENT ABOUT REQUEST TO STOP OR MODIFY ORDER OF WAGE ASSIGNMENT
Filing Date
5/4/2001
Description
PSM - Pet To Stop/Modify Wage Assgnt
Docket Date
5/14/2001
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/4/1992
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
11/4/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/1992
Description
CMR - Cmr
Docket Date
11/3/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/1992
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
10/26/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/1992
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/21/1992
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO WITHDRAW AS ATTY OF RECORD & ORDER
Filing Date
10/19/1992
Description
214 - 214
Docket Date
10/22/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/1992
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
9/29/1992
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
MOTHER
Filing Date
9/29/1992
Description
OOA - Order Of Assignment
Docket Date
10/21/1992
Filing Party
NOTE:
AUTOMATIC
Filing Date
9/29/1992
Description
999 - ME: Other
Docket Date
10/5/1992
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/25/1992 3:00:00 PM
Description
DDI - Decree Of Dissolution
Docket Date
9/25/1992 3:00:00 PM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
9/25/1992
Description
999 - ME: Other
Docket Date
10/5/1992
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/25/1992
Description
211 - ME: Dissolution Hearing
Docket Date
9/30/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/28/1992
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
8/31/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/1992
Description
ADE - Application For Default
Docket Date
8/14/1992
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/13/1992
Description
AED - Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
8/14/1992
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/5/1992
Description
999 - ME: Other
Docket Date
8/6/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/1992
Description
999 - ME: Other
Docket Date
7/27/1992
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
7/9/1992
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
7/9/1992
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
7/9/1992
Description
PET - Petition
Docket Date
7/9/1992
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
7/9/1992
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
7/9/1992
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file