« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
DR1991-002187
Judge:
DRJUN, DRJUN
File Date:
2/15/1991
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Domestic Relations
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
J Lana Jean Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Bruce Delane Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/1991 6:23:00 PM
Description
DDI - Decree Of Dissolution
Docket Date
10/22/1991 6:23:00 PM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
10/22/1991
Description
211 - ME: Dissolution Hearing
Docket Date
10/23/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/5/1991
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
9/9/1991
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/23/1991
Description
208 - ME: Case On Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
8/27/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/1991
Description
SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/31/1991
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
7/16/1991
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
7/17/1991
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
7/16/1991
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
7/18/1991
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
7/16/1991
Description
PET - Petition
Docket Date
7/17/1991
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE;CONVERSION
Filing Date
7/16/1991
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
7/17/1991
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
7/16/1991
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/18/1991
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
FOR WAIVER OF COSTS FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS
Filing Date
7/16/1991
Description
PRA - Praecipe
Docket Date
7/17/1991
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/23/1991
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated
Docket Date
5/9/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/15/1991
Description
ADE - Application For Default
Docket Date
3/18/1991
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
AND ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Filing Date
2/19/1991
Description
999 - ME: Other
Docket Date
2/20/1991
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
INFORMATION FOR CONCILIATION COURT
Filing Date
2/19/1991
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
2/20/1991
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/15/1991
Description
ODC - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
2/15/1991
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/15/1991
Description
ADC - App/Deferral/Costs/Fees/Ser
Docket Date
2/15/1991
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/15/1991
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
2/15/1991
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/15/1991
Description
PET - Petition
Docket Date
2/15/1991
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/15/1991
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
2/20/1991
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
AGAINST BOTH PETITIONER & RESPONDENT
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file