« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
DR1990-010344
Judge:
Halvorson, Ashley
File Date:
9/4/1990
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Domestic Relations
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Sandra K Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Randall S Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/1991
Description
301 - 301
Docket Date
6/17/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/1991
Description
208 - ME: Case On Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
3/13/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/1990
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
9/27/1990
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/4/1990
Description
AMC - Amended Complaint
Docket Date
9/4/1990
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/4/1990
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
9/4/1990
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/4/1990
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
9/4/1990
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/4/1990
Description
999 - ME: Other
Docket Date
9/4/1990
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
OATH FOR WAIVER-DEFERRAL OF COSTS FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY SHERIFF OR CONSTABLE
Filing Date
9/4/1990
Description
ADC - App/Deferral/Costs/Fees/Ser
Docket Date
9/4/1990
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/4/1990
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
9/4/1990
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/4/1990
Description
SDP - Schedule Div/Comm Prop/Relief
Docket Date
9/4/1990
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/4/1990
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
9/4/1990
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/4/1990
Description
ODC - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
9/4/1990
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/4/1990
Description
999 - ME: Other
Docket Date
9/4/1990
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
ION PROCEEDINGS
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file