« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
DR1989-093029
Judge:
McDowell, David
File Date:
10/12/1989
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Domestic Relations
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Pamla Sue Glick
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
John Stewart
Party Name
Thomas Edward Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2000
Description
RAC - Request for Change Of Address/Name
Docket Date
3/24/2000
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/27/1992
Description
LET - Letter
Docket Date
6/10/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/1992
Description
CMR - Cmr
Docket Date
6/4/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/1992
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
4/28/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/1992
Description
LET - Letter
Docket Date
3/16/1992
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/9/1990
Description
CMR - Cmr
Docket Date
2/13/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/2/1990 10:14:00 AM
Description
DDI - Decree Of Dissolution
Docket Date
1/2/1990 10:14:00 AM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
1/2/1990
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
1/31/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/2/1990
Description
OOA - Order Of Assignment
Docket Date
1/8/1990
Filing Party
NOTE:
AUTOMATIC/THOMAS EDWARD MEREDITH/ 464.00 MO/BINDING 14 DAYS AFTER SERVICE
Filing Date
1/2/1990
Description
241 - ME: Decree Signed By Court
Docket Date
1/3/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/1989
Description
AED - Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
11/8/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/1989
Description
ADE - Application For Default
Docket Date
11/8/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/1989
Description
999 - ME: Other
Docket Date
10/31/1989
Filing Party
NOTE:
WAIVER OF ACCEPTANCE
Filing Date
10/27/1989
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
10/31/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/1989
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
10/31/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/1989
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
10/13/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/1989
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
10/13/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/1989
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
10/13/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/1989
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
10/13/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/2/1989
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
1/3/1990
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file