« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
DR1989-091042
Judge:
McDowell, David
File Date:
4/13/1989
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Domestic Relations
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Grace A Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Russell W Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/1990
Description
301 - 301
Docket Date
1/16/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/1989
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
10/3/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/22/1989
Description
208 - ME: Case On Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
9/22/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/13/1989
Description
999 - ME: Other
Docket Date
4/17/1989
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
FEES AND FEES FOR SERVICE
Filing Date
4/13/1989
Description
999 - ME: Other
Docket Date
4/17/1989
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
WAIVER OF FEES
Filing Date
4/13/1989
Description
SDP - Schedule Div/Comm Prop/Relief
Docket Date
4/17/1989
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/13/1989
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
4/17/1989
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/13/1989
Description
999 - ME: Other
Docket Date
4/17/1989
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/13/1989
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
4/17/1989
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/13/1989
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
4/17/1989
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/13/1989
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
4/17/1989
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file