« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
DR1989-002086
Judge:
DRJUN, DRJUN
File Date:
2/22/1989
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Domestic Relations
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Peggy L Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Mary McDonald
Party Name
Timothy R Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/1989 11:32:00 AM
Description
DDI - Decree Of Dissolution
Docket Date
7/28/1989 11:32:00 AM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
7/28/1989
Description
241 - ME: Decree Signed By Court
Docket Date
8/1/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/1989
Description
ADE - Application For Default
Docket Date
7/13/1989
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
7/7/1989
Description
AED - Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
7/13/1989
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/15/1989
Description
211 - ME: Dissolution Hearing
Docket Date
6/16/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/26/1989
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
5/30/1989
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
OF DUE DILIGENCE
Filing Date
4/7/1989
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
4/12/1989
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
OF UNKNOWN RESIDENCE
Filing Date
4/7/1989
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
4/12/1989
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
SHOWING CIRCUMSTANCES WARRANTING UTILIZATION OF ALTERNATIVE METHOD OF SERVICE
Filing Date
2/22/1989
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
2/23/1989
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/22/1989
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
2/23/1989
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/22/1989
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
2/23/1989
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file