« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
DR1988-009719
Judge:
DRJUN, DRJUN
File Date:
9/12/1988
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Domestic Relations
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Theodore Richard Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Craig Collins
Party Name
Sally Lucille Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/25/1988 3:00:00 PM
Description
DDI - Decree Of Dissolution
Docket Date
11/25/1988 3:00:00 PM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
11/25/1988
Description
241 - ME: Decree Signed By Court
Docket Date
12/1/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/1988
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
10/17/1988
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/12/1988
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
9/14/1988
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/12/1988
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
9/14/1988
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/12/1988
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
9/14/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/1988
Description
PET - Petition
Docket Date
9/14/1988
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file