« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
DR1987-015090
Judge:
Brooks, Robert
File Date:
11/18/1987
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Domestic Relations
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Daniel Robert Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Martin Laprade
Party Name
Karen Elizabeth Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Robert Forquer
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/1996
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
9/3/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/1996
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
8/29/1996
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
STOPPING AN ORD OF WAGE ASSIGNMENT
Filing Date
8/13/1996
Description
253 - Stop/Mod OOA IWO granted
Docket Date
8/14/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/1996
Description
253 - Stop/Mod OOA IWO granted
Docket Date
8/19/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/1996
Description
CER - Certificate
Docket Date
5/30/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF MAILING
Filing Date
5/15/1996
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
5/23/1996
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO STOP WAGE ASSIGNMENT ORD
Filing Date
7/22/1992
Description
LET - Letter
Docket Date
7/31/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/6/1992
Description
LET - Letter
Docket Date
7/10/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/1989
Description
SOR - Stipulation And Order
Docket Date
9/26/1989
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
FOR MODIFICATION OF DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE
Filing Date
9/21/1989
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
9/25/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/7/1989
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated
Docket Date
4/14/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/1989
Description
SAI - Spouse's Affidavit Of Income
Docket Date
4/5/1989
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
4/4/1989
Description
PSC - Petition For Order To Show Cause
Docket Date
4/5/1989
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
RE CONTEMPT
Filing Date
4/4/1989
Description
OSC - Order To Show Cause
Docket Date
4/5/1989
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
RE CONTEMPT
Filing Date
4/4/1989
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/5/1989
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
TO COMPLY WITH RULE 6.4 RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURES
Filing Date
3/21/1989
Description
AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service
Docket Date
3/24/1989
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
3/13/1989
Description
MOR - Motion And Order
Docket Date
3/14/1989
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO WITHDRAW
Filing Date
3/10/1989
Description
214 - 214
Docket Date
3/18/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/1988
Description
CMR - Cmr
Docket Date
4/25/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/13/1988
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
4/18/1988
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
MAILED 4-13-88
Filing Date
4/11/1988
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
4/19/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
MATTER HEARD AS IF BY DEFAULT
Filing Date
4/11/1988
Description
GDS - Child Sup/Guideline Data Sheet
Docket Date
4/19/1988
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/11/1988
Description
241 - ME: Decree Signed By Court
Docket Date
4/14/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER OF ASSIGNMENT
Filing Date
4/11/1988
Description
OOA - Order Of Assignment
Docket Date
4/18/1988
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
AUTOMATIC AGAINST P1 $600 PER MO BINDING 14 DAYS AFTER SERVICE 4/11/88
Filing Date
4/11/1988
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
4/19/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/1988
Description
DDI - Decree Of Dissolution
Docket Date
4/11/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
4/1/1988
Description
999 - ME: Other
Docket Date
4/5/1988
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR MEDIATION / ORDER UNSIGNED
Filing Date
3/23/1988
Description
NDE - Nde
Docket Date
3/25/1988
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
3/17/1988
Description
NDE - Nde
Docket Date
3/18/1988
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
3/17/1988
Description
SUB - Subpoena
Docket Date
3/18/1988
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
3/16/1988
Description
LWE - List Of Witnesses/Exhibits
Docket Date
3/17/1988
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/16/1988
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/17/1988
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
OF CHANGE OF JUDGE
Filing Date
3/8/1988
Description
OSC - Order To Show Cause
Docket Date
3/11/1988
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
FOR 4-8-88
Filing Date
3/3/1988
Description
PSC - Petition For Order To Show Cause
Docket Date
3/7/1988
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
RE TEMP ORDERS
Filing Date
3/3/1988
Description
SAI - Spouse's Affidavit Of Income
Docket Date
3/7/1988
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/22/1988
Description
214 - 214
Docket Date
2/25/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR PETITIONER
Filing Date
2/22/1988
Description
SOR - Stipulation And Order
Docket Date
2/25/1988
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
FOR SUB OF COUNSEL FOR P1
Filing Date
2/19/1988
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
2/22/1988
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
Filing Date
2/19/1988
Description
NSE - Notice Of Service
Docket Date
2/23/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF NONUNIFORM INTERROG AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO RESPONDENT
Filing Date
2/18/1988
Description
NDE - Nde
Docket Date
2/22/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/1988
Description
AED - Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
1/14/1988
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
1/11/1988
Description
ADE - Application For Default
Docket Date
1/14/1988
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/10/1987
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
12/14/1987
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR RESP KAREN E MEREDITH
Filing Date
12/10/1987
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
12/14/1987
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO RESP KAREN E MEREDITH
Filing Date
11/18/1987
Description
DRM - Declaration Re Minor Children
Docket Date
11/30/1987
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/1987
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
11/30/1987
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/1987
Description
PET - Petition
Docket Date
11/23/1987
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/18/1987
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
11/23/1987
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file